EP2090507 - Propulsion system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glacier Bay, Inc. 2930 Faber Street Union City CA 94587 / US | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alston, Gerald Allen c/o Glacier Bay, Inc. 2930 Faber Street Union City, CA 94587 / US | 02 /
Nelson, Bruce c/o Glacier Bay, Inc. 2930 Faber Street Union City, CA 94587 / US | 03 /
Dobbs, Justin c/o Glacier Bay, Inc. 2930 Faber Street Union City, CA 94587 / US | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Uwe Patentanwalt Moritzstrasse 22 13597 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | Fischer, Uwe Patentanwalt Moritzstrasse 22 13597 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 09001998.5 | 13.02.2009 | [2009/34] | Priority number, date | US20080064087P | 15.02.2008 Original published format: US 64087 P | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2090507 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Classification | IPC: | B63H9/04, B63J3/04, B63H21/20, B63H21/22 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
B63J3/04 (EP,US);
B63H21/00 (EP,US);
B63H21/20 (EP,US);
B63H21/213 (EP,US);
B63J2003/046 (EP,US);
Y02T70/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Antriebssystem | [2009/34] | English: | Propulsion system | [2009/34] | French: | Système de propulsion | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US5527194 | US6289749 | US6418794 | US6951145 | US7469593 | US2006175996 |