EP2218824 - Screed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joseph Vögele AG Joseph-Vögele-Strasse 1 67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2012/52] |
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states Joseph Vögele AG Joseph-Vögele-Strasse 1 67067 Ludwigshafen/Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Joseph Vögele AG Joseph-Vögele-Strasse 1 67075 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2010/33] | For all designated states Joseph Vögele AG Neckarauer Strasse 168-228 68146 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Munz, Roman Fränkelstrasse 5 67435 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
Grimm, Frank 130 Middle Spring Road Shippensburg, PA 17257 / US | 03 /
Buschmann, Martin Johanniterstrasse 7 67435 Neustadt / DE | [2010/33] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/33] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09002132.0 | 16.02.2009 | [2010/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2218824 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2218824 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/48 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
E01C19/48 (EP,US);
E01C2301/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/17] |
Former [2010/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einbaubohle | [2010/33] | English: | Screed | [2010/33] | French: | Poutre lisseuse | [2010/33] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2009 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 18.02.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.03.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0507258 (CATERPILLAR PAVING PROD [US]); | [A]JPH07102521 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD); | [A]JPH11124811 (HANDA KIKAI KK); | [A]US6595719 (OHSEKI MASAYUKI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US4379653 | US4818140 | US2002106243 | US2002106242 | US2007258769 |