EP2093057 - Method and apparatus for removing used stamping foil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/35] | Method for removing used stamping foil and stamping device with continuously working foil removal device | ||
[2017/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPM Steuer GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Mey-Strasse 7 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [2009/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steuer, Marc Panoramaweg 46 71111 Waldenbuch / DE | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/28] |
Former [2009/35] | Muschik, Thomas Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner, Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09002166.8 | 17.02.2009 | [2009/35] | Priority number, date | DE20081011493 | 20.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008011493 | [2009/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2093057 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2093057 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41F19/06 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
B41F19/064 (EP,US);
B41P2219/21 (EP,US);
B41P2219/22 (EP,US);
B41P2219/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/28] |
Former [2009/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Entsorgung von verbrauchter Prägefolienbahn | [2017/03] | English: | Method and apparatus for removing used stamping foil | [2017/03] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'élimination d'une bande d'estampage usagée | [2017/03] |
Former [2009/35] | Verfahren zur Entsorgung von verbrauchter Prägefolienbahn sowie Prägevorrichtung mit kontinuierlich arbeitender Entsorgungseinrichtung | ||
Former [2009/35] | Method for removing used stamping foil and stamping device with continuously working foil removal device | ||
Former [2009/35] | Procédé d'élimination d'une bande d'estampage usagée et dispositif d'estampage doté d'un dispositif d'élimination travaillant en continu | Examination procedure | 14.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2009 | CY | 12.07.2017 | CZ | 12.07.2017 | DK | 12.07.2017 | EE | 12.07.2017 | FI | 12.07.2017 | HR | 12.07.2017 | LT | 12.07.2017 | LV | 12.07.2017 | MC | 12.07.2017 | MK | 12.07.2017 | MT | 12.07.2017 | PL | 12.07.2017 | PT | 12.07.2017 | RO | 12.07.2017 | SE | 12.07.2017 | SI | 12.07.2017 | SK | 12.07.2017 | TR | 12.07.2017 | BG | 12.10.2017 | NO | 12.10.2017 | GR | 13.10.2017 | IS | 12.11.2017 | GB | 17.02.2018 | IE | 17.02.2018 | LU | 17.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | FR | 28.02.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 17.02.2009 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PT | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
GB | 17.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
GB | 17.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
GB | 17.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 12.07.2017 | |
NO | 12.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH522503 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 8 * columns 1-4; figures 1,2,4 *; | [DY]DE9420707U (STEUER ARMIN [DE]) [DY] 1-7,10,12-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0960845 (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 5,11 * abstract * * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0005] , [0014] , [0015] , [0017] , [0023] , [0024] , [0030] * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0987205 (STEUER ARMIN [DE]) [A] 2-4,8,10,12,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] - [0028] - [0030] * * figure 1 *; | [DYA]EP0989086 (STEUER ARMIN [DE]) [DY] 4,6,7,10,13,14 * the whole document * [A] 1-3; | [DXY]EP1683635 (STEUER GMBH PRINTING TECHNOLOG [DE]) [DX] 8,9,15 * abstract * * claims 8,11 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0014] - [0023]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 1-7,10-14; | [PA]EP1970334 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [PA] 5,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0012] , [0017] , [0022] ** figures 1,2,2a * | Examination | EP0718099 | by applicant | GB2254586 | EP0718099 | EP0989086 | DE102005003787 |