EP2093371 - Vehicle door with profile adjustment mechanism and related method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thetford BV Nijverheidsweg 29 4870 AD Etten-Leur / NL | [2017/04] |
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states Thetford Corporation 7101 Jackson Road Ann Arbor MI 48106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Eil, Louis Nijverheidsweg 23 4870 Etten-Leur / NL | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Clarenbach, Carl-Philipp, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/26] | Grosse, Rainer, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Grosse, Rainer, et al Gleiss Große Schrell & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09002385.4 | 20.02.2009 | [2009/35] | Priority number, date | US20080030773 | 22.02.2008 Original published format: US 30773 | US20090152855 | 16.02.2009 Original published format: US 152855 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2093371 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2093371 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2093371 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/70, B60J5/04 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
B60J5/049 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/35] | E06B3/70 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2013/40] |
Former [2009/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugtür mit Profiljustierungsmechanismus und zugehöriges Verfahren | [2009/35] | English: | Vehicle door with profile adjustment mechanism and related method | [2009/35] | French: | Portière de véhicule avec mécanismes d'ajustement du profil et procédé associé | [2009/35] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 28.08.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.10.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2014 | 29.02.2016 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5046778 (LARSEN DOUGLAS C [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * figure 9 * * column 2, line 53 - line 63 * [I] 4,7; | [A]JPH09279952 (TANIGUCHI ISAO, et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |