EP2138123 - Surgical system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Kazue c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 02 /
Honda, Satoshi c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 03 /
Sanai, Hideo c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09002444.9 | 20.02.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | US20080146908 | 26.06.2008 Original published format: US 146908 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2138123 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2138123 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/12, A61N7/00, A61N1/08, A61N1/40 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
A61B18/1402 (EP,US);
A61N7/02 (US);
A61B2017/320069 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0088 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00916 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/36] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Chirurgisches System | [2010/01] | English: | Surgical system | [2010/01] | French: | Système chirurgical | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 01.07.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]JPH10225462 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [XD] 1-4,6-9,11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0047] - [0050] - [0110] - [0113]; figures 13,16 * [Y] 5,10; | [Y]WO2005048809 (SHERWOOD SERV AG [CH], et al) [Y] 10* page 15, paragraph 3 *; | [Y]US2006270916 (SKWAREK THOMAS R [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0106] * | by applicant | JPH10225462 |