EP2094052 - Timeslot sharing protocol for wireless communication networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guo, Jianlin 500 Broadway Apartment 2101 Malden MA 02148 / US | 02 /
Duan, Chunjie 29 Pine Street Medfield MA / US | 03 /
Bhatti, Ghulam M. 7 Francis Avenue Unit 701 Mansfield MA 2048 / US | 04 /
Zhang, Jinyun 170 Gore Street Unit 616 Cambridge MA 02141 / US | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09002465.4 | 20.02.2009 | [2009/35] | Priority number, date | US20080030281P | 21.02.2008 Original published format: US 30281 P | US20080193911 | 19.08.2008 Original published format: US 193911 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2094052 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2094052 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/04, // H04W84/12 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
H04W72/0446 (EP,US);
H04B7/2656 (EP,US);
H04L12/4035 (EP);
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W74/02 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/35] | H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | DE [2010/21] |
Former [2009/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Protokoll zur gemeinsamen Nutzung von Zeitfenstern für drahtlose Kommunikationsnetze | [2009/35] | English: | Timeslot sharing protocol for wireless communication networks | [2009/35] | French: | Protocole de partage de créneaux pour réseaux de communication sans fil | [2009/35] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.04.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005076544 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,6-9,11,14-18,20,23-25 * abstract * * page 1, line 11 - line 24 * * page 3, line 3 - line 24 * * page 4, line 11 - line 20 * * page 7, line 8 - page 10, line 25 * * page 11, line 11 - page 12, line 12 * * page 12, line 27 - line 32 * * page 15, line 1 - page 16, line 4 * * claim 33 *; | [X]EP1199848 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1,4,5,9,12,13,18,21,22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] , [0008] , [0009] , [0019] , [0020] , [0023] , [0025] * * figure 1b *; | [X]WO03030459 (XTREMESPECTRUM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9-12,14,18-21 * abstract * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 27 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 5 * * page 11, line 22 - page 12, line 25 * * page 20, line 24 - page 21, line 26 * * page 23, line 8 - page 24, line 11 * * page 28, line 8 - page 31, line 5 * * page 31, line 15 - page 34, line 17 * * page 36, line 6 - line 13 * * page 37, line 9 - line 12 * * page 42, line 4 - line 10 * * figures 3,5,8C,8D,8H,10,11,12A,12B,12C,12D *; | [X]US2006092909 (HO JIN-MENG [US]) [X] 1,2,6,9,10,14,15,18,19,23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0009] , [0015] - [0017] - [0022] , [0024] , [0025] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2003199272 (SHVODIAN WILLIAM M [US], et al) [A] 3-6,8,11-13,15,17,20-23,25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0009] , [0018] , [0020] , [0027] , [0029] , [0047] - [0053] - [0061] , [0072] - [0075] * * figures 3,5-8 *; | [XP] - JIANLIN GUO ET AL, "Efficient Medium Access Protocol for Wireless Sensor Networks", SENSOR TECHNOLOGIES AND APPLICATIONS, 2008. SENSORCOMM '08. SECOND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080825), ISBN 978-0-7695-3330-8, pages 13 - 17, XP031319533 [XP] 1-25 * whole document * | [A] - ANONYMOUS ED - ANONYMOUS, "IEEE standard for information technology - telecommunications and information exchange between systems - local and metropolitan area networks - specific requirements part 15.3: wireless medium access control (MAC) and physical layer (PHY) specifications for high rate wireless personal area networks", IEEE STANDARD; [IEEE STANDARD], IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20030101), ISBN 978-0-7381-3704-9, pages _1 - 315, XP017600965 [A] 1-25 * page 11 - page 13 * * page 108 - page 110 * * page 117 * * page 121 - page 122 * * page 138 - page 142 * * page 171 - page 190 * | [A] - ANONYMOUS ED - ANONYMOUS, "IEEE standard for information technology - telecommunications and information exchange between systems - local and metropolitan area networks specific requirements part 15.4: wireless medium access control (MAC) and physical layer (PHY) specifications for low-rate wireless personal area networks (LR", IEEE STANDARD; [IEEE STANDARD], IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20030101), ISBN 978-0-7381-3677-6, pages _1 - 670, XP017600966 [A] 1-25 * page 13 - page 16 * * page 117 - page 120 * * page 131 - page 133 * * page 139 - page 164 * | by applicant | WO2005076544 | EP1199848 | WO03030459 | US2006092909 | US2003199272 |