EP2103817 - Sensor and work device with same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FESTO AG & Co. KG Ruiter Strasse 82 73734 Esslingen / DE | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Welker, Florian Tiergartenweg 42 73061 Ebersbach / DE | 02 /
Kiessling, Albert, Dr. Haldenstrasse 21 71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Abel, Martin Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Abel, Martin Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Abel, Martin Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09002564.4 | 24.02.2009 | [2009/39] | Priority number, date | DE20081015447 | 22.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008015447 | [2009/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2103817 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2103817 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2103817 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/28 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
F15B15/2892 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2013/16] |
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sensor und damit ausgestattetes Arbeitsgerät | [2014/08] | English: | Sensor and work device with same | [2009/39] | French: | Capteur et appareil de travail en étant équipé | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/39] | Sensor and damit ausgestattetes Arbeitsgerät | Examination procedure | 05.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 09.02.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE202006005609U (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [X] 1,3,7-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0018] - [0024] - [0029] - [0035] - [0043] - [0050] , [0055] - [0061]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2,6; | [A]DE20211518U (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * page 14, paragraphs 1-2 * * page 17, paragraph 2 - page 18, paragraph 2; figures 3,4 *; | [AD]DE19716736 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [AD] 1; | [AD]DE10227941 (SECATEC ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | WO2007115619 | DE19716736 | DE102004001788 | DE10227941 | DE20211518U |