EP2099080 - Nb3Sn superconducting wire manufactured by internal Sn process and precursor for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 10-26, Wakinohama-cho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2009/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Hiroyuki c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 02 /
Hase, Takashi c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 03 /
Zaitsu, Kyoji c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09002671.7 | 25.02.2009 | [2009/37] | Priority number, date | JP20080052183 | 03.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008052183 | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2099080 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/24 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
H10N60/0184 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | Supraleitender Nb3Sn-Draht, der mit einem internen Sn-Verfahren hergestellt wird, und Vorläuferverbindung zum Herstellen des Drahts | [2009/37] | English: | Nb3Sn superconducting wire manufactured by internal Sn process and precursor for manufacturing the same | [2009/37] | French: | Fil supraconducteur en Nb3Sn fabriqué par procédé Sn interne et précurseur pour sa fabrication | [2009/37] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 09.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/02] | 29.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5127149 (OZERYANSKY GENNADY [US]); | [Y]JP2000348547 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [Y]US2007186998 (KATO HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | Examination | JP4185548B | by applicant | JPS49114389 |