EP2096522 - Terminal device, terminal system and computer-readable recording medium recording program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Hiroaki c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 09002768.1 | 26.02.2009 | [2009/36] | Priority number, date | JP20080050859 | 29.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008050859 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2096522 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2096522 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033, G06F3/048, G06F1/16, G06F3/12 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
G06F3/04847 (EP,US);
G06F3/0338 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1614 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/36] | G06F3/033, G06F3/048, G06F1/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | Endgerät, Endgerätsystem und computerlesbares Aufzeichnungsprogramm zum Aufzeichnen von Medien | [2009/36] | English: | Terminal device, terminal system and computer-readable recording medium recording program | [2009/36] | French: | Dispositif de terminal, système de terminal, support d'enregistrement lisible sur ordinateur et programme d'enregistrement | [2009/36] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 01.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/08] | 08.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4969647 (MICAL ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 36 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 28 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 8 [I] 5,7; | [A]JPH05307377 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH06324805 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]EP1176500 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0038] ** figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2004179042 (BEAR ERIC JUSTIN GOULD [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0167] * * figures 1,2,7A,16A-20D *; | [A]US2005083417 (BATTLES AMY E [US], et al) [A] 7,8 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 3-7 *; | [A]EP1675013 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 7,8 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * figures 1,4 * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0066] *; | [Y]US2007064253 (YANG SEUNG-SIK [KR]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 1,3 *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Exchangeable image file format", (20080218), Wikipedia, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Exchangeable_image_file_format&oldid=192326070, (20101206), XP002612780 [A] 7,8 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "BMP file format", (20080225), Wikipedia, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=BMP_file_format&oldid=193921241, (20101206), XP002612781 [A] 7,8 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH08221365 |