EP2070535 - Drugs for relieving carbonyl stress and peritoneal dialysates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kurokawa, Kiyoshi Ichigaya Hills 401, 49 Ichigaya-yanagimachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-0061 / JP | For all designated states Miyata, Toshio 20-1-1-43, Sanjomachi Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 981-0935 / JP | For all designated states TOKAI UNIVERSITY EDUCATIONAL SYSTEM 2-28-4 Tomigaya, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8677 / JP | [2015/16] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Kurokawa, Kiyoshi Ichigaya Hills 401, 49 Ichigaya-yanagimachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-0061 / JP | ||
For all designated states Miyata, Toshio 102 Ekuseru Isehara, 16-25, Sakuradai 2-chome Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-1132 / JP | |||
For all designated states TOKAI UNIVERSITY EDUCATIONAL SYSTEM 2-28-4 Tomigaya, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8677 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toshio, Miyata 20-1-1-43, Sanjomachi, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 981-0935 / JP | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/28] |
Former [2009/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09002868.9 | 23.08.1999 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | JP19980237108 | 24.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23710898 | JP19990155393 | 02.06.1999 Original published format: JP 15539399 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070535 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2070535 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4415, A61P7/08 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/203 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (KR);
A61K31/155 (EP,US);
A61K31/4965 (EP,US);
A61K33/00 (EP,US);
A61M1/287 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/203, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4965, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/00, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2015/28] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wirkstoffe zur Minderung von Carbonylstress und Peritonealdialysaten | [2009/25] | English: | Drugs for relieving carbonyl stress and peritoneal dialysates | [2009/25] | French: | Médicaments pour décharger le stress carbonyle et les dialysats péritonéaux | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 15.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 12.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99938581.8 / EP1108434 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990938581) is 17.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.07.2015 | CY | 08.07.2015 | DK | 08.07.2015 | ES | 08.07.2015 | FI | 08.07.2015 | IT | 08.07.2015 | MC | 08.07.2015 | NL | 08.07.2015 | SE | 08.07.2015 | IE | 23.08.2015 | LU | 23.08.2015 | BE | 31.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | FR | 08.09.2015 | GB | 08.10.2015 | GR | 09.10.2015 | PT | 09.11.2015 | DE | 01.03.2016 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/40] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 08.09.2015 | ||
GB | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
DE | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 08.09.2015 | ||
GB | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
DE | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
GB | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
DE | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
DE | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 08.07.2015 | |
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
GR | 09.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9709981 (UNIV KANSAS MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [Y] 1-11 * claim 13 *; | [Y] - LAMB E J ET AL, "IN VITRO FORMATION OF ADVANCED GLYCATION END PRODUCTS IN PERITONEALDIALYSIS FLUID", KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199506), vol. 47, no. 6, ISSN 0085-2538, pages 1768 - 1774, XP000964894 [Y] 1-11 * page 1768, abstract * * page 1769, right-hand column, last paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ki.1995.244 | [Y] - POSTHUMA NYNKE ET AL, "In vitro advanced glycation and product formation in glucose and icodextrin containing peritoneal dialysis fluids with and without aminoguanidine", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEPHROLOGY, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (199709), vol. 9, no. Program and Abstr, ISSN 1046-6673, page 270A, XP009095333 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * | [Y] - BOOTH A A ET AL, "PYRIDOXAMINE AND THIAMINE PYROPHOSPHATE INHIBIT FORMATION OF ANTIGENIC ANVANCED GLYCATION END PRODUCTS (AGE): COMPARISON WITH AMINOGUANIDINE USING OVERALL AND ISOLATED POST-AMADORI KINETICS", FASEB JOURNAL, FED. OF AMERICAN SOC. FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, BETHESDA, MD, US, (19960401), vol. 10, no. 6, ISSN 0892-6638, page A1100, XP000891764 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * | [Y] - KHALIFAH R G ET AL, "EFFECTS OF PYRIDOXAMINE, A NOVEL POST-AMADORI AGE INHIBITOR, ON NEPHROPATHY INDUCED BY GLYCATED ALBUMIN", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEPHROLOGY, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19970901), vol. 9, no. PROGRAM ABSTR, ISSN 1046-6673, page 641A, XP000965172 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * | [Y] - BOOTH A A ET AL, "THIAMINE PYROPHOSPHATE AND PYRIDOXAMINE INHIBIT THE FORMATION OF ANTIGENIC ADVANCED GLYCATION END-PRODUCTS: COMPARISON WITH AMINOGUANIDINE", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (19960101), vol. 220, no. 1, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 113 - 119, XP002024845 [Y] 1-11 * page 113, abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1996.0366 | Examination | - SHINOHARA M ET AL, "OVEREXPRESSION OF GLYOXALASE-I BOVINE ENDOTHELIAL CELLS INHIBITS INTRACELLULAR ADVANCED GLYCATION ENDPRODUCT FORMATION AND PREVENTS HYPERGLYCEMIA-INDUCED INCREASES IN MACROMOLECULAR ENDOCYTOSIS", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, US, (19980301), vol. 101, no. 5, doi:10.1172/JCI119885, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 1142 - 1147, XP001005287 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI119885 | - VOZIYAN P A ET AL., "A Post-Amadori Inhibitor Pyridoxamine Also Inhibits Chemical Modification of Proteins by Scavenging Carbonyl Intermediates of Carbohydrate and Lipid Degradation", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20020201), vol. 277, no. 5, pages 3397 - 3403 | by applicant | JPS58169458 | JPS62142114 | JPS62249908 | JPS62249709 | JPS6319149 | JPS6456614 | JPS6483059 | JPH02156 | JPH02765 | JPH02753 | JPH0242053 | JPH0262885 | JPH02167264 | JPH03148220 | JPH03161441 | WO9111997 | JPH03204874 | JPH03240725 | JPH03261772 | JPH049375 | JPH04502611 | JPH04308586 | JPH059114 | JPH05105633 | JPH05505189 | JPH05201993 | JPH05255130 | JPH05310565 | JPH069380 | WO9404520 | JPH06135968 | JPH06192089 | JPH06206818 | JPH06256280 | JPH06287179 | JPH06287180 | JPH06298737 | JPH06298738 | JPH06305964 | JPH06305959 | JPH07500580 | JPH07500811 | JPH07503713 | JPH07133264 | JPH07196498 | JPH07206838 | JPH07247296 | JPH07323084 | JPH0859485 | JPH0871146 | JPH0885701 | JPH08131541 | JPH08157473 | JPH0940626 | JPH0940519 | JPH0959258 | JPH0959233 | WO9709981 | JPH09124471 | JPH09221427 | JPH09241165 | JPH09315960 | JPH1094598 | JPH10158244 | JPH10158265 | JPH10167965 | JPH10175954 | JPH10182460 | - WILKIE, M.E. ET AL., PERIL. DIAL. INT., (1997), vol. 17, pages 47 - 50 | - FALLER, B. ET AL., KIDNEY INT., (1996), vol. 50, no. 56, pages 81 - 85 | - MIYATA, T. ET AL., KIDNEY INT., (1997), vol. 51, pages 1170 - 1181 | - MIYATA, T. ET AL., J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (1996), vol. 7, pages 1198 - 1206 | - MIYATA, T. ET AL., KIDNEY INT., (1998), vol. 54, pages 1290 - 1295 | - MIYATA,T. ET AL., J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (1998), vol. 9, pages 2349 - 2356 | - MIYATA, T. ET AL., KIDNEY INT., (1999), vol. 55, pages 389 - 399 | - YAMADA, K. ET AL., CLIN. NEPHROL., (1994), vol. 42, pages 354 - 361 | - NAKAYAMA, M. ET AL., KIDNEY INT., (1997), vol. 51, pages 182 - 186 | - MIYATA, T. ET AL., J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL. | - COMBET, S. ET AL., J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL. | - INAGI, R. ET AL., J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL. | - RICHARD, J. U. ET AL., FUND. APPL. TOXIC., (1984), vol. 4, pages 843 - 853 | - THORNALLEY, R.J., ENDOCRINOL: METAB., (1996), vol. 3, pages 149 - 166 | - FOOTE, E. F. ET AL., AM. J. KIDNEY DIS., (1995), vol. 25, pages 420 - 425 | - S. NAKAMURA, DIABETES, (1997), vol. 46, pages 895 - 899 | - MAILLARD, L. C., COMPT. REND. SOC. BIOL., (1912), vol. 72, page 599 | - RAHBAR. S., CLIN. CHIM. ACTA, (1968), vol. 22, page 296 | - HORIE, K. ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1997), vol. 100, pages 2995 - 3004 | - KREDIET RT, KIDNEY .INT, (1999), vol. 55, pages 341 - 356 | - HEIMBURGER 0 ET AL., KIDNEY INT, (1990), vol. 38, pages 495 - 506 | - IMHOLZ AL ET AL., KIDNEY INT, (1993), vol. 43, pages 1339 - 1346 | - HO-DAC-PANNEKEET MM ET AL., PERIT DIAL INT, (1997), vol. 17, pages 144 - 150 | - SENGER DR ET AL., SCIENCE, (1983), vol. 219, pages 983 - 985 | - CONNOLLY DT ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1989), vol. 264, pages 20017 - 20024 | - HOOD JD ET AL., AM J PHYSIOL, (1998), vol. 274, pages 1054 - 1058 | - CLAUSS M ET AL., J EXP MED, (1990), vol. 172, pages 1535 - 1545 | - MELDER RJ ET AL., NAT MED, (1996), vol. 2, pages 992 - 997 | - THOMAS KA, J BIOL CHEM, (1996), vol. 271, pages 603 - 606 | - FERRARA N ET AL., ENDOCR REV, (1997), vol. 18, pages 4 - 25 | - SHOJI M ET AL., AM J PATHOL, (1998), vol. 152, pages 399 - 411 | - HJELLE JT ET AL., PERIT DIAL INT, (1989), vol. 9, pages 341 - 347 | - MIYATA, KIDNEY INT, (1999), vol. 55, pages 389 - 399 | - IKEDA K ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 35, pages 8075 - 8083 | - MIYATA T ET AL., KIDNEY INT, (1997), vol. 51, pages 1170 - 1181 | - T. MIYATA ET AL., J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL, (1996), vol. 7, pages 1198 - 1206 | - T. MIYATA, PROC. NATL. ACAD. ACI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 2353 - 2358 | - LEVINE, R. L. ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1994), vol. 233, pages 346 - 357 | - C. B. ET AL., PERIT. DIAL. INT., (1993), vol. 13, pages 208 - 213 | - NILSSON, C. B. ET AL., PERIT. DIAL. INT., (1993), vol. 13, pages 208 - 213 | - T. MIYATA ET AL., J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (1996), vol. 7, pages 1198 - 1206 | - T. MIYATA ET AL., PROC: NATL. ACAD. SIC. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 2353 - 2358 | - T. MIYATA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1996), vol. 93, pages 2353 - 2358 |