EP2107442 - Motor vehicles with a foot pedal assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/41] | Foot pedal utility for motor vehicles | ||
[2011/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2012/28] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tiemann, Jörg Klemenshang 11 38154 Königslutter / DE | 02 /
Steinmetz, Peter Güldenkamp 71 38108 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
Thiele, Frank Giebelstrasse 4a 38471 Rühen / DE | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/47] | Application number, filing date | 09002903.4 | 28.02.2009 | [2009/41] | Priority number, date | DE20081016415 | 31.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008016415 | [2009/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2107442 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2107442 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | [2010/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2107442 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05G1/32, G05G1/36 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
G05G1/36 (EP);
B60R21/09 (EP);
B60T7/065 (EP);
G05G1/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/41] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug mit einem Fusshebelwerk | [2011/16] | English: | Motor vehicles with a foot pedal assembly | [2011/16] | French: | Véhicules automobiles avec un mécanisme de levier de pédale | [2011/16] |
Former [2009/41] | Fusshebelwerk an Kraftfahrzeugen | ||
Former [2009/41] | Foot pedal utility for motor vehicles | ||
Former [2009/41] | Mécanisme de levier de pédale sur des véhicules automobiles | Examination procedure | 05.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 27.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2009 | CY | 23.11.2011 | DK | 23.11.2011 | EE | 23.11.2011 | FI | 23.11.2011 | HR | 23.11.2011 | IE | 23.11.2011 | LT | 23.11.2011 | LV | 23.11.2011 | MK | 23.11.2011 | MT | 23.11.2011 | NL | 23.11.2011 | PL | 23.11.2011 | RO | 23.11.2011 | SE | 23.11.2011 | SI | 23.11.2011 | SK | 23.11.2011 | TR | 23.11.2011 | BG | 23.02.2012 | NO | 23.02.2012 | GR | 24.02.2012 | BE | 28.02.2012 | LU | 28.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | ES | 05.03.2012 | IS | 23.03.2012 | PT | 23.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
LU | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
MT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
MK | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 23.11.2011 | |
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 23.11.2011 | |
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
LV | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NO | 23.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NO | 23.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE835840 (RUHRSTAHL AG) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US2989875 (MACNEIL TORRANCE DONALD) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1164226 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 3 - page 4; figure - *; | [A]FR2739077 (PEUGEOT [FR]) [A] 1,2 * page 6; figure 5 *; | [A]FR2740882 (PEUGEOT [FR]) [A] 1,2 * page 6 - page 7; figure 5 *; | [XI]DE19601800 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document * [I] 3,4 | by applicant | EP0805080 | DE69806149T | DE19601800 | DE102006014228 |