EP2101015 - Method for manufacturing a wall of a construction structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RUND-STAHL-BAU GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. RSB-Haus Schilfweg 1 6972 Fussach / AT | [2009/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mathis, Hugo, Mag. Dipl.-Ing. Im Rebgärtle 1 6900 Bregenz / AT | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Ralf U., et al Hofmann & Fechner Patentanwälte Hörnlingerstrasse 3 Postfach 5 6830 Rankweil / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Hofmann, Ralf U., et al Hefel & Hofmann Patentanwälte Egelseestrasse 65a Postfach 61 6806 Feldkirch / AT | Application number, filing date | 09003091.7 | 04.03.2009 | [2009/38] | Priority number, date | AT20080000393 | 12.03.2008 Original published format: AT 3932008 | AT20080000394 | 12.03.2008 Original published format: AT 3942008 | [2009/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2101015 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2101015 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E04G11/04 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
E04G11/04 (EP);
E04G11/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2015/08] |
Former [2009/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Wand eines Bauwerks | [2009/38] | English: | Method for manufacturing a wall of a construction structure | [2009/38] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un mur de construction | [2009/38] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 29.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDAY]AT346060B (HEINZLE OTTO) [XD] 1,4,7 * the whole document * [A] 12-15 [Y] 1-3,5,6,8,9,11; | [YDA]WO2008019408 (RUND STAHL BAU GMBH & CO [AT], et al) [YD] 1,5,6,8,9,11 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,7,10,12-15; | [Y]DE1932517 (SIEMENS BAUUNION GMBH) [Y] 2,3 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 1; figure -; claim 5 *; | [A]EP0350525 (GLEITBAU GES MIT BESCHRANKTER [AT]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 10-35 * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 41 * * column 9, lines 5-35 * * figure - *; | [A]CH360196 (ALUMINIUM IND AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE2733628 (DYCKERHOFF & WIDMANN AG) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | AT346060B | WO2008019408 | DE2733628 |