EP2103485 - Surroundings monitoring device, method and computer program product for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okugi, Tomokazu c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
Chiba, Masaki c/o MAZDA CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
Okuda, Kazuyuki c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 04 /
Ohe, Yuka c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003114.7 | 04.03.2009 | [2009/39] | Priority number, date | JP20080071872 | 19.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008071872 | JP20080071870 | 19.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008071870 | JP20080071871 | 19.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008071871 | JP20080071873 | 19.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008071873 | JP20080071874 | 19.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008071874 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2103485 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2103485 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/00 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
B60R1/24 (EP,US);
G08G1/163 (EP);
G08G1/166 (EP);
G08G1/167 (EP);
B60R2300/304 (EP,US);
B60R2300/307 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2010/27] |
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Umgebungsüberwachungsvorrichtung, Verfahren und Computerprogrammprodukt für ein Fahrzeug | [2009/39] | English: | Surroundings monitoring device, method and computer program product for a vehicle | [2009/39] | French: | Dispositif de surveillance de l'environnement, procédé et produit de programme informatique pour un véhicule | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 29.04.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/31] | 15.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2845331 (ERMAN SARL CABINET [LU]) [A] 1,16,17* page 7, lines 15-23; figure 2 *; | [X]EP1642770 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,5 * paragraphs [0020] - [0023] - [0026] *; | [X]DE102006012773 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0016] - [0028] - [0032] , [0033]; figure - *; | [X]US2007053551 (KUBO YUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-9 * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] , [0031] , [0033] - [0036] - [0039] - [0043]; figure - * | by applicant | JPH11338074 | JP2007172462 |