EP2100801 - Device for securing the load of a commercial vehicle, method for securing a load and commercial vehicle with such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kögel Trailer GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1 89349 Burtenbach / DE | [2011/27] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Kögel Trailer GmbH & Co. KG Dieselstrasse 27 86368 Gersthofen / DE | ||
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states Kögel Fahrzeugwerke GmbH Industriestrasse 1 89349 Burtenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hellenschmidt, Dieter Wellerstrasse 8 89134 Blaustein / DE | 02 /
Merk, Jochen Holderweg 26 88339 Bad Waldsee / DE | 03 /
Rohland, Jürgen Drillgasse 5 89312 Günzburg / DE | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Kilchert, Jochen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Kilchert, Jochen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003233.5 | 05.03.2009 | [2009/38] | Priority number, date | DE20081013329 | 10.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008013329 | [2009/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2100801 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2100801 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/02, B60P7/135, B60P7/08 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
B62D33/0207 (EP);
B60P7/0892 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Sicherung der Ladung eines Nutzfahrzeugs, Verfahren zum Sichern von Ladung und Nutzfahrzeug mit einer derartigen Vorrichtung | [2009/38] | English: | Device for securing the load of a commercial vehicle, method for securing a load and commercial vehicle with such a device | [2009/38] | French: | Dispositif de sécurisation du chargement d'un véhicule utilitaire, procédé de sécurisation du chargement et véhicule utilitaire doté d'un tel dispositif | [2009/38] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 24.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 30.10.2009 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2010/40] | 01.12.2010 | Resumption of proceedings | [2010/40] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2009 | CY | 06.07.2011 | CZ | 06.07.2011 | DK | 06.07.2011 | EE | 06.07.2011 | FI | 06.07.2011 | HR | 06.07.2011 | IE | 06.07.2011 | LT | 06.07.2011 | LV | 06.07.2011 | MK | 06.07.2011 | MT | 06.07.2011 | NL | 06.07.2011 | PL | 06.07.2011 | RO | 06.07.2011 | SE | 06.07.2011 | SI | 06.07.2011 | SK | 06.07.2011 | TR | 06.07.2011 | BG | 06.10.2011 | NO | 06.10.2011 | GR | 07.10.2011 | IS | 06.11.2011 | PT | 07.11.2011 | LU | 05.03.2012 | BE | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MK | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
TR | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MK | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
TR | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MK | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | SI | 06.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2262094 (GLOGGER ADOLF) [A] 1-15 * figure 5 *; | [AD]DE9303415U (HMB - HOLZMASCHINENBAU GMBH, 7815 KIRCHZARTEN, DE) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]DE20214074U (WIHAG NUTZFAHRZEUGFABRIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE202004000990U (PAEHLER GMBH & CO BAU UND SPED [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 * | by applicant | DE9303415U | EP0982188 |