EP2103988 - Object recognizing display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2012/45] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | ||
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Seiki 408-1301, Jugong 9-danji Apt. Ssangyong-dong Chunan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 02 /
You, Bong-Hyun 505-305, Samsung 5-cha Apt. Jinsan Maeul Pungdeokcheon-dong Suji-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Choi, Hee-Jin 1302, Doosan WIV Centium Apt. 155-5 Chunho 3-dong Gangdong-gu Seoul / KR | [2014/10] |
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
Takahashi, Seiki 408-1301, Jugong 9-danji Apt. Ssangyong-dong Chunan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | ||
02 /
You, Bong-Hyun 505-305, Samsung 5-cha Apt. Jinsan Maeul Pungdeokcheon-dong Suji-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Choi, Hee-Jin 1302, Doosan WIV Centium Apt. 155-5 Chunho 3-dong Gangdong-gu Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Weitzel, Wolfgang Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Weitzel, Wolfgang Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Weitzel, Wolfgang Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patentanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003259.0 | 06.03.2009 | [2009/39] | Priority number, date | KR20080023417 | 13.03.2008 Original published format: KR 20080023417 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2103988 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2103988 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2103988 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/133, G02F1/1362, G06F3/041, G06F3/042 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
G02F1/13338 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02F1/1343 (KR);
G02F1/136 (KR);
G02F1/136209 (EP,US);
G06F3/0412 (EP,US);
G06F3/042 (EP);
G02F1/13312 (EP,US);
G02F1/133514 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2010/30] |
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Objekterkennungsanzeigevorrichtung | [2009/39] | English: | Object recognizing display device | [2009/39] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage reconnaissant les objets | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 30.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]FR2906379 (LG PHILIPS LCD CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1,2 * page 1, line 21 - page 12, line 5; figures 4-9 *; | [Y]US2007296688 (NAKAMURA HIROKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,7,9-13 * paragraphs [0008] , [0018] , [0020] - [0038] - [0078] - [0085]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]JP2006003857 (TOSHIBA MATSUSHITA DISPLAY TEC) [Y] 1-3,7,9-13 * paragraphs [0058] - [0069]; figures 5,19,20,25 *; | [Y]US2008006828 (ZHANG HONGYONG [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0042] - [0075]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US6661478 (WAKAHARA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 66 - column 7, line 55; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2004174475 (LAN WEI-CHOU [TW], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0031] - [0041]; figures 1-6 * |