EP2111947 - Processing machine for door and window frame profiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Urban GmbH & Co. Maschinenbau KG Dornierstrasse 5 87700 Memmingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states Urban GmbH & Co. Maschinenbau KG Dornierstrasse 5 D-87700 Memmingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2009/44] | Representative(s) | Schulz, Manfred, et al Pfister & Pfister Patent-& Rechtsanwälte Hallhof 6-7 87700 Memmingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Schulz, Manfred, et al Pfister & Pfister Patent-& Rechtsanwälte Hallhof 6-7 87700 Memmingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003875.3 | 18.03.2009 | [2009/44] | Priority number, date | DE20081016736 | 31.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008016736 | [2009/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2111947 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2111947 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q17/20, B23Q17/24 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
B23Q17/24 (EP);
B23Q17/20 (EP);
B29C65/02 (EP);
B29C65/2069 (EP);
B29C66/9672 (EP);
B29C66/5223 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29K2027/06 (EP);
B29K2101/12 (EP);
B29L2031/005 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/5223, B29C65/00 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/44] | Title | German: | Bearbeitungsmaschine für Tür- beziehungsweise Fensterrahmenprofile | [2009/44] | English: | Processing machine for door and window frame profiles | [2009/44] | French: | Machine de traitement pour profilés de cadre de porte, respectivement, de fenêtre | [2009/44] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 28.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.07.2013 | 05.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/47] | 15.07.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 16.07.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0470417 (URBAN MASCHINENBAU [DE]) [Y] 1-3,12,13 * column 1 * * column 2, line 33 - column 2, line 40 * [A] 7-11; | [X]DE19612243 (WEGOMA MASCHF GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2001028025 (PEASE ALFRED A [US]) [Y] 1-3,12,13* paragraphs [0015] , [0029] - [0031]; figures 2,6 *; | [Y]DE10260670 (ZEISS CARL [DE]) [Y] 1-3,12,13 * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] , [0026] , [0027]; figure 1 * | Examination | WO8607443 | by applicant | WO8607443 | DE19612243 | DE10260670 |