EP2103249 - Surgical microscopy system having an optical coherence tomography facility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Meditec AG Göschwitzer Strasse 51-52 07745 Jena / DE | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Meditec, Inc. 5160 Hacienda Drive Dublin, CA 94568 / US | [2016/23] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Meditec AG Göschwitzer Strasse 51-52 07745 Jena / DE | ||
For all designated states Carl Zeiss Meditec, Inc. 5160 Hacienda Drive Dublin California 94568 / US | |||
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Surgical GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | ||
For all designated states Carl Zeiss Meditec, Inc. 5160 Hacienda Drive Dublin California 94568 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauger, Christoph, Dr. Bertha-von-Suttner-Weg 46 73431 Aalen / DE | 02 /
Seesselberg, Markus Droste-Huelshoff-Weg 11 73431 Aalen / DE | 03 /
O'Hara, Keith 858 S K St Livermore, CA 94550 / US | 04 /
Qiu, Yue 5030 Owens Dr. 132 Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | 05 /
Wei, Xing 5060 Haven Place 108 Dublin, CA 94568 / US | 06 /
Horn, Jochen M. 545 Leavenworth 2 San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | 07 /
Reimer, Peter Grenadierstrasse 12 73479 Ellwangen / DE | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/23] | Diehl & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 9 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003905.8 | 18.03.2009 | [2009/39] | Priority number, date | US20080070197P | 19.03.2008 Original published format: US 70197 P | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2103249 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2103249 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2103249 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/13, A61B90/20, // A61B3/107, A61B5/00, A61F9/008, G02B21/00 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
G02B21/22 (EP,US);
A61B3/102 (EP,US);
A61B3/13 (EP,US);
A61B90/20 (EP,US);
G01N21/4795 (EP,US);
G02B21/0012 (EP,US);
G02B21/082 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/39] | A61B3/13, A61B19/00, // A61B3/107, A61B5/00, A61F9/008, G02B21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/23] |
Former [2010/21] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Chirurgisches Mikroskopsystem mit optischer Kohärenz-Tomographieeinrichtung | [2009/39] | English: | Surgical microscopy system having an optical coherence tomography facility | [2009/39] | French: | Système de microscopie chirurgicale disposant d'une installation de tomographie à cohérence optique | [2009/39] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 24.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15002689.6 / EP3005938 | EP18211581.6 / EP3479753 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO03070090 (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0014] - [0021] * * figure 1 * [Y] 11-15; | [X]WO2006052479 (OPTOVUE INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] * * figure 4 *; | [X]EP0815801 (ZEISS CARL [DE], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * page 3, line 53 - page 4, line 57 * * figures 1,3 *; | [YA]GB2399627 (TOPCON CORP [JP]) [Y] 11-15 * page 6, line 22 - page 8, line 26 * * figure 1 * [A] 1; | [A]EP0941692 (SCHWIND GMBH & CO KG HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0026] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2001036002 (TEARNEY GUILLERMO [US], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * paragraph [0071] * * figure 4 * | Examination | DE102005013949 | by applicant | EP0697611 | US5991090 | DE19837135 | - Y. XU ET AL., "MEMS based non-rotatory circumferential scanning optical probe for endoscopic optical coherence tomography", PRO. OF SPIE, (2007), vol. 6627 |