EP2065622 - Oil pressure control for continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-Chome Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kashiwase, Hajime Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-To / JP | [2012/16] |
Former [2009/23] | 01 /
Kashiwase, Hajime Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-To / JP | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/23] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003917.3 | 15.02.2001 | [2009/23] | Priority number, date | JP20000041850 | 18.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000041850 | JP20000041851 | 18.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000041851 | JP20000059731 | 06.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000059731 | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2065622 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2065622 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2065622 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/00 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
F16H61/66272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2009/23] | Title | German: | Öldrucksteuerung für kontinuierlich veränderliches Getriebe | [2009/23] | English: | Oil pressure control for continuously variable transmission | [2009/23] | French: | Contrôle de pression d'huile pour transmission variable continue | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 09.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01103737.1 / EP1126197 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010103737) is 21.12.2005 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6015359 (KUNII RIKIYA [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 11 - column 4, line 63; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5269726 (SWANSON GLENN E [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 12, line 54 - column 17, line 8; figure 11 *; | [A]EP0288080 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 14, lines 20-44; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0615080 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 7, line 48 - column 8, line 5; figure 13 * | by applicant | JPH10325458 |