EP2218803 - Method and device for carbonisation of steel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | [2010/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laumen, Christoph Wilderich-Lang-Straße 4 80634 München / DE | [2010/33] | Representative(s) | Gellner, Bernd Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | Gellner, Bernd Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Marken Dr. Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 09003980.1 | 19.03.2009 | [2010/33] | Priority number, date | DE20091008664 | 12.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009008664 | [2010/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2218803 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C23C8/20, C23C8/22 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
C23C8/20 (EP);
C23C8/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/17] |
Former [2010/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Aufkohlung von Stahl | [2010/33] | English: | Method and device for carbonisation of steel | [2010/33] | French: | Dispositif et procédé destinés à la carburation d'acier | [2010/33] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/35] | 29.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005016831 (PAGANESSI JOSEPH E [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] - [0008] - [0014] - [0020] - [0027] - [0031]; claims 1,3,9,18 *; | [X]US2003217511 (WADA TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,7,10 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] *; | [A]EP0532386 (INNOVATIQUE SA [FR]) [A] 2,8,12 * page 3, lines 35-45; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0320763 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,7,10 * column 1, line 23 - column 3, line 24; claim 1 * | by applicant | - F. GRAF ET AL., Thermogravimetrische Untersuchungen zur Aufkohlungswirkung verschiedener Kohlenwasserstoffe, CARL HANSER VERLAG, (2002), vol. 61 |