EP2138180 - A composition for treating cancer containing a porous silicon nanobomb as an active ingredient [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INHA-INDUSTRY PARTNERSHIP INSTITUTE Inha University 253 Yonghyeon-dong Nam-ku Incheon 402-751 / KR | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Chongmu 912-303 Bamgasimaeul Kunyoung Villa 1354 Jeongbalsan-Dong Ilsandong-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 410-761 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Hohyeong 1206 Hando Apt., Seongjeong-dong Cheonan-si Chungcheongsam-do 330-170 / KR | 03 /
Hong, Chanseok 115-701 Donga Poonglim Apt., Hagik-dong Nam-gu Incheon 402-873 / KR | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09004026.2 | 20.03.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | KR20080060110 | 25.06.2008 Original published format: KR 20080060110 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2138180 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/00, A61K41/00, A61P35/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
A61K41/0052 (EP,US);
C01G23/00 (KR);
A61K41/0028 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
B82B3/00 (KR);
C01G25/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zur Behandlung von Krebs mit porösen Siliciumnanobomben als Wirkstoff | [2010/01] | English: | A composition for treating cancer containing a porous silicon nanobomb as an active ingredient | [2010/01] | French: | Composition pour le traitement du cancer contenant une nanobombe en silicium poreux en tant qu'ingrédient actif | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 11.08.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR100836167B (INHA IND PARTNERSHIP INST [KR]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X] - CHONGMU LEE ET AL, "The properties of porous silicon as a therapeutic agent via the new photodynamic therapy", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, CAMBRIDGE, GB, vol. 17, no. 25, ISSN 0959-9428, (20070701), pages 2648 - 2653, (20070423), XP002512017 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B700892A | by applicant | - L. R. HIRCH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2002), vol. 100, page 13549 | - T. SEKI ET AL., CANCER (PHILADELPHIA), (1999), vol. 85, page 1694 | - B. PANCHAPAKESAN ET AL., NANOBIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 1, page 133 | - N. W. S. KAM ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2005), vol. 102, page 11600 |