EP2077282 - Antigen binding molecules with increased Fc receptor binding affinity and effector function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Glycart AG Wagistrasse 18 8952 Schlieren-Zuerich / CH | [2010/49] |
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states GlycArt Biotechnology AG Wagistrasse 18 8952 Schlieren (Zürich) / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umana, Pablo Freistrasse 159 8032 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Brünker, Peter Burgwiesenstrasse 3c 8335 Hittnau / CH | 03 /
Ferrara Koller, Claudia Göblistrasse 12 6300 Zug / CH | 04 /
Suter, Tobias Dorfstrasse 16 5210 Windisch / CH | 05 /
Püntener, Ursula Dorfstrasse 16 5210 Windisch / CH | 06 /
Mössner, Ekkehard Zeppelinstrasse 13 8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | [2009/28] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/52] |
Former [2010/12] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/28] | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09004064.3 | 05.11.2004 | [2009/28] | Priority number, date | US20030517096P | 05.11.2003 Original published format: US 517096 P | [2009/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2077282 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2077282 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2077282 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61K39/00 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
C07K16/2887 (EP,NO,US);
C07K16/28 (EA,KR,NO);
A61K39/395 (EA,NO);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP,NO);
A61P19/02 (EP,NO);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP,NO);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,EA,NO);
A61P35/02 (EP,NO);
A61P37/00 (EP,EA,NO);
A61P37/02 (EP,NO);
A61P37/06 (EP,NO);
A61P37/08 (EP,NO);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/40 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP,NO);
A61P7/04 (EP,NO);
A61P7/06 (EP,NO);
A61P9/00 (EP,NO);
A61P9/10 (EP,NO);
C07K16/18 (KR);
C12N15/11 (NO,US);
C12N15/63 (EP,EA,NO,US);
C12N5/10 (EA,NO);
C12N9/1051 (EP,NO,US);
C12Y204/01144 (EP,NO,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/14 (NO,US);
C07K2317/21 (NO,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,NO,US);
C07K2317/41 (EP,NO,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,NO,US);
C07K2317/53 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/567 (EP,US);
C07K2317/72 (EP,NO,US);
C07K2317/73 (NO,US);
C07K2317/732 (EP,US);
C07K2317/734 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US);
C07K2319/01 (NO,US);
Y10S530/808 (EP,US);
Y10S530/866 (EP,US);
Y10S530/867 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/32] | C07K16/28, A61K39/395 | ||
Former IPC [2009/28] | C07K16/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/52] |
Former [2009/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 20.03.2009 | HR | 20.03.2009 | LT | 20.03.2009 | LV | 20.03.2009 | MK | 20.03.2009 | YU | 20.03.2009 | Title | German: | Antigenbindende Moleküle mit erhöhter Fc-Rezeptor-Bindeaffinität und Effektorfunktion | [2009/28] | English: | Antigen binding molecules with increased Fc receptor binding affinity and effector function | [2009/28] | French: | Molécules de liaison d'antigène avec affinité de liaison de récepteur Fc améliorée et fonction d'effecteur | [2009/28] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2010 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 13.08.2010 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 21.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.10.2015 | 23.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04798998.3 / EP1692182 | Divisional application(s) | EP10185277.0 / EP2380910 | EP10185313.3 / EP2380911 | EP10185340.6 / EP2348051 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040798998) is 13.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.10.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US3773919 | EP0125023 | EP0173494 | WO8804936 | US4816567 | WO9207466 | US5225539 | WO9704801 | US5736137 | WO9856418 | WO9954342 | US6180370 | EP1176195 | US2002128448 | US2003003097 | US2003040606 | US6602684 | US2003175269 | US6632927 | US2004093621 | US6737056 | US2004132101 | US2004132066 | WO2004065540 | US2004185045 | US20030441307 | US20030495142 |