EP2105794 - Novel photoacid generator, resist composition, and patterning process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2015/34] |
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohsawa, Youichi c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 02 /
Kinsho, Takeshi c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Takeru c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 04 /
Hasegawa, Koji c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 05 /
Ohashi, Masaki c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | [2015/34] |
Former [2009/40] | 01 /
Ohsawa, Youichi c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kinsho, Takeshi c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Watanabe, Takeru c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Hasegawa, Koji c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Ohashi, Masaki c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [2015/34] |
Former [2009/40] | Merkle, Gebhard TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09004198.9 | 24.03.2009 | [2009/40] | Priority number, date | JP20080078049 | 25.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008078049 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2105794 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2105794 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/004, G03F7/20, G03F7/039 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
G03F7/0045 (EP,KR,US);
C07C309/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07C25/18 (EP,US);
C07C381/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D333/46 (EP,KR,US);
C07D493/08 (EP,KR,US);
C07D493/18 (EP,US);
C08K5/42 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0046 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0382 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0392 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0395 (EP,US);
G03F7/0397 (EP,US);
G03F7/2041 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/40] | G03F7/004, G03F7/039, G03F7/038, C07C309/17, C07C381/12, C08K5/42 | Designated contracting states | DE [2015/34] |
Former [2010/22] | DE | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Neuartiger Photosäuregenerator, Harzzusammensetzung und Strukturierungsverfahren | [2009/40] | English: | Novel photoacid generator, resist composition, and patterning process | [2009/40] | French: | Nouveau générateur photo-acide, composition de réserve et procédé de formation de motifs | [2015/14] |
Former [2009/40] | Nouveau générateur photo-acide, composition de réserve et procédé de formation | Examination procedure | 22.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 31.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007078269 (HARADA YUKAKO [JP], et al); | [A]US2007218401 (ANDO NOBUO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2008013551 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [E]WO2009057769 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH04230645 | JPH0725846 | JPH08311018 | JPH0915848 | JPH0973173 | JPH0990637 | JPH0995479 | US5650483 | JPH09208554 | JPH09230588 | JPH09301948 | JP2906999B | JPH11190904 | JP2000314956 | JP2000336121 | JP2001122850 | JP2001181221 | US6261738 | JP2001233842 | JP2002193887 | JP2002193925 | JP2002214774 | JP2003066612 | JP2003107706 | JP2003252855 | JP2004002252 | JP2004004561 | JP2004115630 | WO2004074242 | JP2004531749 | JP2005008766 | JP2005084365 | JP2006306856 | JP2007145797 | JP2007161707 | JP2007297590 |