Designated contracting states | DE | | FR | | Examination procedure | 04.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | European patent granted | 20.03.2013 | Opposition procedure | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2014 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 30.09.2009 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 30.09.2009 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL BA RS | | Event date: | 12.05.2010 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20100326 | | Event date: | 02.06.2010 | | Event description: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Designated State(s): | DE FR | | Event date: | 10.10.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | F16D 1/08 20060101ALI20120906BHEP | | Event date: | 10.10.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | F16C 35/063 20060101ALI20120906BHEP | | Event date: | 10.10.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | F16D 3/223 20110101ALI20120906BHEP | | Event date: | 10.10.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | F16D 1/10 20060101ALI20120906BHEP | | Event date: | 10.10.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B60B 27/00 20060101AFI20120906BHEP | | Event date: | 20.03.2013 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR | | Event date: | 16.05.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602009014032 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | Effective DATE: | 20130516 | | Event date: | 26.02.2014 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20140102 | | Event date: | 03.04.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602009014032 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | Effective DATE: | 20140102 | | Event date: | 30.04.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20150317 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Event date: | 29.05.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20150309 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Event date: | 09.03.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 7 | | Event date: | 01.10.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 602009014032 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Event date: | 30.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20161130 | | Event date: | 31.01.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20161001 | | Event date: | 31.01.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160331 | | Event date: | 15.02.2013 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 11.02.2013 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 16.11.2012 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 28.08.2009 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 24.01.2014 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 24.01.2014 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |