EP2234091 - Safety element, in particular safety label with manipulation verification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hueck Folien Ges.m.b.H. Gewerbepark 30 4342 Baumgartenberg / AT | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riegler, Josef Baumgartenberg 81 4342 Baumgartenberg / AT | 02 /
Hilburger, Johann Hangstrasse 18 92712 Pirk / DE | 03 /
Mayrhofer, Marco Rohrstrasse 8 4522 Sierning / AT | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Landgraf, Elvira Schulfeld 26 4210 Gallneukirchen / AT | [2015/13] |
Former [2010/39] | Landgraf, Elvira Schulfeld 26 4210 Gallneukirchen / AT | Application number, filing date | 09004424.9 | 27.03.2009 | [2010/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2234091 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2234091 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/02 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
G09F3/0292 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2843 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | Sicherheitselement, insbesondere Sicherheitsetikett mit Manipulationsnachweis | [2010/39] | English: | Safety element, in particular safety label with manipulation verification | [2010/39] | French: | Elément de sécurité, en particulier étiquette de sécurité avec vérification de la manipulation | [2010/39] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 02.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 10.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE Opponent's representative Zinsinger, Norbert, et al, et al Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Merianstraße 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE Opponent's representative Zinsinger, Norbert, et al, et al Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | 02.02.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.08.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.09.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/08] | 09.10.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 25.03.2015 | CH | 25.03.2015 | CY | 25.03.2015 | CZ | 25.03.2015 | DK | 25.03.2015 | EE | 25.03.2015 | HR | 25.03.2015 | LI | 25.03.2015 | LT | 25.03.2015 | LV | 25.03.2015 | MC | 25.03.2015 | MT | 25.03.2015 | SK | 25.03.2015 | TR | 25.03.2015 | IE | 27.03.2015 | NO | 25.06.2015 | GR | 26.06.2015 | IS | 25.07.2015 | PT | 27.07.2015 | [2018/21] |
Former [2017/38] | BG | 25.03.2015 | |
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
TR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 27.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 27.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 27.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | HR | 25.03.2015 | |
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | HR | 25.03.2015 | |
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | HR | 25.03.2015 | |
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0401466 (LANDIS & GYR BETRIEBS AG [CH]) [X] 1-7,9-13 * column 2, line 21 - column 5, line 12; figure 1 *; | [X]DE4132476 (MATTHIESEN GEB SIEVERS GERDA [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-13* column 2, line 60 - column 11, line 37; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5658411 (FAYKISH LYNN E [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-13 * column 3, line 53 - column 6, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US6196383 (PINCHEN STEPHEN PAUL [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,10-13 * column 2, line 14 - column 4, line 50; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO03066344 (OPTAGLIO LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,9-13 * page 16, paragraph 3 - page 18, paragraph 3; figures 3-7a *; | [X]FR2867590 (FASVER SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 10, line 21 - page 13, line 24; figures 3a-7b; example 1 * | by applicant | EP0401466 | WO0193231 | WO03066344 | FR2867590 |