Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012070310 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP53866 | 25.03.2010 | EP09004471 | 27.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5314188B | Global Dossier | 16.10.2013 | B2 | JP2012522160 | 20.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP53866 | 25.03.2010 | EP09004471 | 27.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2411630 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2013 | B1 | EP2411630 | 01.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP53866 | 25.03.2010 | EP10715130 | 25.03.2010 | EP09004471 | 27.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102365423 | Global Dossier | 29.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP53866 | 25.03.2010 | EP09004471 | 27.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010108972 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09004471 | 27.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2233692 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09004471 | 27.03.2009 |