EP2233692 - Axial turboengine rotor with rotor cooling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahmad, Fathi Moselstrasse 1 41564 Kaarst / DE | [2010/39] | Application number, filing date | 09004471.0 | 27.03.2009 | [2010/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2233692 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/08, F01D25/12 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
F01D5/087 (EP,US);
F01D25/12 (EP,US);
F05D2260/201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/22] |
Former [2010/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Axialturbomaschinenrotor mit Schaufelkühlung | [2010/39] | English: | Axial turboengine rotor with rotor cooling | [2010/39] | French: | Rotor de turbomachine axiale doté d'un refroidissement d'aube | [2010/39] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 06.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2011/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2931624 (COURTNEY HYDE JOHN ALAN) [X] 1,5-9 * figure 2 *; | [A]GB1209419 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1,5-9 * page 3, line 65 - line 70 ** figure 5 *; | [X]EP1413715 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,5-9 * figure - *; | [X]WO2009008944 (SIEMENS ENERGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5-9 * figure 3 * |