EP2078548 - Secure digital data format and code enforced policy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2009/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitten, Jon Marcus Randall 197 241st Place SE Sammarnish, WA 98074 / US | 02 /
Sharpe, Tracy Clayton 722 10th Avenue E, Apt.2 Seattle, WA 98102 / US | 03 /
Asmi, Yasser B. 15937 NE 83rd W Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 04 /
Lange, Jonathan E. 12928 NE 26th Place Bellevue, WA 98005 / US | 05 /
Pirich, Christopher Michael 843 NE 84th Street Seattle, WA 98115 / US | 06 /
Thomason, Jonathan Gerald 9626 NE 24th Street Clyde Hill, WA 98004 / US | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09004610.3 | 13.01.2003 | [2009/29] | Priority number, date | US20020101999 | 19.03.2002 Original published format: US 101999 | [2009/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2078548 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2078548 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2078548 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/12 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
A63F13/12 (EP);
A63F13/71 (US);
A63F13/30 (EP);
A63F13/73 (US);
A63F13/77 (US);
A63F13/95 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Title | German: | Sicheres digitales Datenformat und codeverstärkte Richtlinie | [2009/29] | English: | Secure digital data format and code enforced policy | [2009/29] | French: | Format de données numériques sécurisées et politique renforcée de code | [2009/29] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03000582.1 / EP1346755 | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2003 | AT | 23.02.2011 | BE | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | SE | 23.02.2011 | SI | 23.02.2011 | SK | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | BG | 23.05.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | ES | 03.06.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ANON, "PKCS#7: Cryptographic Message Syntax Standard", RSA LABORATORIES TECHNICAL NOTE, RSA Laboratories, (19931101), XP002564582 [X] 1-15 * page 9, paragraph 9 * | [A] - "VERISIGN(TM) CPS, PASSAGE", VERISIGN CPS, XX, XX, (199705), pages 1 - 115, XP002934610 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [08.1] * | [T] - ANON/VERISIGN, "Software Publisher Digital IDs for Microsoft Authenticode Technology", (2004), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://www.verisign.com.au/developer/msauthenticode.shtml, (20040722), XP002289494 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - DAVID BECKER, "Hackers, programmers "improve" Xbox", (20011212), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://news.com.com/Hackers,+programmers+"improve"+Xbox/2100-1040_3-276907.html?tag=st.rn, (20040722), XP002289495 [A] 1-15 * page 2 * | [XP] - ANDREW HUANG, "Keeping secrets in Hardware: the Microsoft XBox Case Study", AI MEMO, CAMBRIDGE MA, (20020526), pages 1 - 15, XP002289496 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * |