EP2241562 - Process for the production of lactones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dierker Markus Paul-Gerhardt-Str.45 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Löhl Thorsten Rolandstr. 25 53179 Bonn / DE | 03 /
Ohlmann Dominik Rotenberger Weg 19 66640 Namborn-Roschberg / DE | 04 /
Gooßen Lukas Freier Wasen 16 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2010/42] | Application number, filing date | 09004697.0 | 31.03.2009 | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2241562 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D315/00 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
C07D307/33 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Lactonen | [2010/42] | English: | Process for the production of lactones | [2010/42] | French: | Procédé de production de lactones | [2010/42] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 05.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/10] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/10] | Divisional application(s) | EP13167765.0 / EP2634181 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.05.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.03.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6022982 (ISBELL TERRY A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-10,12 * claims 1,20-23 * * columns 2-5; claims 1-23; table 1 * [Y] 1-13; | [XY] - YANG ET AL., "Intramolecular Additions of Alcohols and Carboxylic Acids to Inert Olefins Catalyzed by Silver(I) Triflate", ORGANIC LETTERS, (20050921), vol. 7, no. 21, pages 4553 - 4556, XP002536301 [X] 1-5,7,11-13 * page 4555; examples 2,4,5; table 4 * * page 4555; example 6, table 3 and examples 2,4,5, table 4 * [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/OL051065F | [XY] - COULOMBEL L ET AL, "Cycloisomerization of olefinic carboxylic acids catalyzed by trifluoromethanesulfonic acid", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS 2005 US, (2005), vol. 35, no. 1, ISSN 0039-7911, pages 153 - 160, XP009119429 [X] 1,2,5-7,11,13 * examples 1,4; table 3 * * page 159; tables 1-3 * [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/SCC-200046534 | [DA] - SHOWELL ET AL., "Perchloric Acid Isomerization of Oleic Acid", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (19680701), vol. 33, no. 7, pages 2697 - 2704, XP002536302 [DA] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JO01271A018 | [Y] - CLUTTERBUCK ET AL., "Gamma-Hydroxystearic Acid", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1924), vol. 125, pages 2330 - 2333, XP009119308 [Y] 1-6,11-13 * page 2332 - page 2333 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/CT9242502330 | [Y] - FUNATOMI ET AL., "Pentafluorophenylammonium triflate (PFPAT): an efficient, practical, and cost-effective catalyst for esterification, thioesterification, transesterification, and macrolactone formation", GREEN CHEMISTRY, (20060907), vol. 8, pages 1022 - 1027, XP002536303 [Y] 1-6,11-13 * figure 2; table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B609181B | by applicant | US2008108116 | FR2623499 | - SHEPARD ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAL OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, (1968), vol. 46, pages 479 - 481 | - SHOWELL ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1968), vol. 33, no. 7, pages 2697 - 2704 | - ZHOU ET AL., APPIIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, (2007), vol. 333, pages 238 - 244 | - I. KROSSING; I. RAABE, ANGEW. CHEM INT. ED, (2004), vol. 43, pages 2066 - 2090 | - I. KROSSING; T. RAABE, ANGEW. CHEM, (2004), vol. 43, pages 2066 - 2072 | - ANGEW. CHEM INT. ED, (2004), page 43 | - ANGEW. CHERN INT ED, (2004), page 43 |