EP2211090 - Spotlight and method of lighting up an object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLP German Light Products GmbH Im Stoeckmaedle 13 76307 Karlsbad / DE | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salm, Markus Sprengerstrasse 28 66265 Heusweiler / DE | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2010/30] | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09004739.0 | 31.03.2009 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | EP20090001044 | 26.01.2009 Original published format: EP 09001044 | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2211090 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2211090 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/00, F21V14/06, G02B19/00, F21V5/00, G02B27/09, G03B21/20, F21W131/406, F21Y101/02 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
F21V7/00 (EP,US);
F21V14/06 (EP,US);
F21V5/002 (EP,US);
F21V5/10 (EP,US);
G02B19/0028 (EP,US);
G02B19/0066 (EP,US);
G02B27/0961 (EP,US);
G03B21/2033 (EP,US);
F21W2131/406 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/30] | F21V7/00, F21V14/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | Scheinwerfer und Verfahren zur Beleuchtung eines Objektes | [2010/30] | English: | Spotlight and method of lighting up an object | [2010/30] | French: | Spot et procédé d'éclairage d'un objet | [2010/30] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 09.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 08.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 08.08.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 08.08.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.09.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   09.09.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2009 | AT | 22.10.2014 | BE | 22.10.2014 | BG | 22.10.2014 | CY | 22.10.2014 | CZ | 22.10.2014 | DK | 22.10.2014 | EE | 22.10.2014 | ES | 22.10.2014 | FI | 22.10.2014 | HR | 22.10.2014 | IT | 22.10.2014 | LT | 22.10.2014 | LV | 22.10.2014 | MC | 22.10.2014 | MK | 22.10.2014 | MT | 22.10.2014 | NL | 22.10.2014 | PL | 22.10.2014 | RO | 22.10.2014 | SE | 22.10.2014 | SI | 22.10.2014 | SK | 22.10.2014 | TR | 22.10.2014 | NO | 22.01.2015 | GR | 23.01.2015 | IS | 22.02.2015 | PT | 23.02.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | IE | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | LU | 31.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/46] | HU | 31.03.2009 | |
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 22.10.2014 | ||
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
IE | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
LU | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 31.03.2009 | |
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
IE | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
LU | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
IE | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
LU | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
IE | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
LU | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
IE | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
LU | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
LU | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 22.10.2014 | |
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 22.10.2014 | |
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 22.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1693615 (MODULED INC [TW], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0 14] , [0 15] , [0 19] * [I] 2; | [A]US2007139922 (KUAN DA-SHUANG [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2008021158 (LIGHT PRESCRIPTIONS INNOVATORS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |