EP2136043 - Particle separator and method for separating particles from an exhaust gas flow of a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Dachauer Strasse 667 80995 München / DE | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Döring, Andreas Heimeranstrasse 2 80339 München / DE | 02 /
Tilinski, Marco Parkstrasse 34b 90571 Schwaig / DE | [2009/52] | Application number, filing date | 09004962.8 | 03.04.2009 | [2009/52] | Priority number, date | DE20081029520 | 21.06.2008 Original published format: DE102008029520 | [2009/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2136043 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2136043 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/021, B01D45/02, B01D45/08 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
F01N3/021 (EP,US);
B01D45/02 (EP,US);
B01D45/08 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | Partikelabscheider sowie Verfahren zur Abscheidung von Partikeln aus einem Abgasstrom einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2009/52] | English: | Particle separator and method for separating particles from an exhaust gas flow of a combustion engine | [2009/52] | French: | Séparateur de particules et procédé de séparation de particules à partir d'un flux de gaz d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2009/52] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 02.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.09.2010 | CZ | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | FI | 15.09.2010 | HR | 15.09.2010 | HU | 15.09.2010 | IE | 15.09.2010 | LT | 15.09.2010 | LV | 15.09.2010 | MK | 15.09.2010 | MT | 15.09.2010 | PL | 15.09.2010 | RO | 15.09.2010 | SI | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | NO | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | ES | 26.12.2010 | IS | 15.01.2011 | PT | 17.01.2011 | LU | 03.04.2011 | BE | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MK | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
TR | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
LU | 03.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MK | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
LU | 03.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MK | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
LU | 03.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MK | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2372316 (CURTIS HAROLD W) [A] 1,35* the whole document *; | [A]DE3609221 (STEYR DAIMLER PUCH AG [AT]) [A] 1,35 * abstract *; | [A]EP0839566 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,35 * figure 1; claims 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0839566 | DE20117873U | DE10153284 | DE10153283 |