EP2107205 - Smoke curtain apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/41] | Smoke curtain | ||
[2017/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coopers Fire Limited Edward House Penner Road Havant Hampshire PO9 1QZ / GB | [2018/46] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states Coopers Blinds Limited Edward House Penner Road Havant Hampshire PO9 1QZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cooper, Paul Andrew Woodhause Ashes Farm Rowlands Castle Hampshire PO9 6BS / GB | 02 /
Reed, James Martin 140, Fawcett Road Southsea Hampshire PO4 0DW / GB | [2018/19] |
Former [2009/41] | 01 /
Cooper, Paul Andrew Woodhause Ashes Farm Rowlands Castle Hampshire PO9 6BS / GB | ||
02 /
Reed, James Martin 140, Fawcett Road Southsea Hampshire PO4 0DW / GB | Representative(s) | Brooks, Nigel Samuel Hill Hampton East Meon Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 1QN / GB | [2018/19] |
Former [2009/41] | Brooks, Nigel Samuel Hill Hampton East Meon Petersfield Hampshire GU32 1QN / GB | Application number, filing date | 09004969.3 | 03.04.2009 | [2009/41] | Priority number, date | GB20080006117 | 04.04.2008 Original published format: GB 0806117 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2107205 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2107205 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2107205 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/13, A62C2/10, // E06B9/17 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
E06B9/13 (EP,US);
A62C2/10 (EP,US);
E06B2009/17053 (EP,US);
Y10T24/27 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/41] | E06B9/13, A62C2/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/19] |
Former [2009/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rauchschutzvorhangvorrichtung | [2017/48] | English: | Smoke curtain apparatus | [2017/48] | French: | Dispositif de rideau coupe-feu | [2017/48] |
Former [2009/41] | Rauchschutzvorhang | ||
Former [2009/41] | Smoke curtain | ||
Former [2009/41] | Rideau coupe-feu | Examination procedure | 20.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 04.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2009 | AT | 09.05.2018 | CY | 09.05.2018 | CZ | 09.05.2018 | EE | 09.05.2018 | ES | 09.05.2018 | FI | 09.05.2018 | HR | 09.05.2018 | IT | 09.05.2018 | LT | 09.05.2018 | LV | 09.05.2018 | MC | 09.05.2018 | MK | 09.05.2018 | MT | 09.05.2018 | NL | 09.05.2018 | PL | 09.05.2018 | RO | 09.05.2018 | SI | 09.05.2018 | SK | 09.05.2018 | TR | 09.05.2018 | BG | 09.08.2018 | GR | 10.08.2018 | IS | 09.09.2018 | PT | 10.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 03.04.2009 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
MT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 03.04.2009 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 09.05.2018 | |
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH1015099 (OHBAYASHI CORP) [X] 1-6,9,13-15 * abstract * [I] 7,8,10-12; | [XI]JPH1033705 (OHBAYASHI CORP) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,13,14 * abstract *[I] 7,8,10-12 | by applicant | EP1491712 |