EP2080488 - Apparatus for shaped magnetic field control for catheter, guidance, control and imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNETECS, INC 10524 S. La Cienega Blvd. Inglewood, CA 90304 / US | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shachar, Yehoshua 2417 22nd Street Santa Monica California 90405 / US | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Lewis, Darren John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Lewis, Darren John, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09005296.0 | 25.05.2006 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | US20050140475 | 27.05.2005 Original published format: US 140475 | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2080488 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2080488 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | [2009/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2080488 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00, A61M25/01, A61B5/06, A61B17/22 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
A61B5/06 (EP,US);
A61B1/00158 (EP,US);
A61B34/70 (EP,US);
A61B34/73 (EP,US);
A61B34/77 (EP,US);
A61B5/0507 (EP,US);
A61B5/062 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00703 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2063 (EP,US);
A61B2034/732 (EP,US);
A61B2090/376 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur geformten Magnetfeldsteuerung für Katheter, Führung, Steuerung und Bildgebung | [2009/30] | English: | Apparatus for shaped magnetic field control for catheter, guidance, control and imaging | [2009/30] | French: | Appareil de contrôle de champ magnétique formé pour un cathéter, guidage, contrôle et imagerie | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 11.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06771577.1 / EP1895930 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2011 | BE | 02.03.2011 | CY | 02.03.2011 | CZ | 02.03.2011 | DK | 02.03.2011 | EE | 02.03.2011 | FI | 02.03.2011 | HU | 02.03.2011 | IT | 02.03.2011 | LT | 02.03.2011 | LV | 02.03.2011 | NL | 02.03.2011 | PL | 02.03.2011 | RO | 02.03.2011 | SE | 02.03.2011 | SI | 02.03.2011 | SK | 02.03.2011 | TR | 02.03.2011 | IE | 25.05.2011 | LU | 25.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | BG | 02.06.2011 | GR | 03.06.2011 | ES | 13.06.2011 | IS | 02.07.2011 | PT | 04.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
TR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LU | 25.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LU | 25.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
BE | 02.03.2011 | ||
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 02.03.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 02.03.2011 | |
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9923934 (STEREOTAXIS INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 1 - page 12, line 1; figures 1-5c * * abstract *; | [A]US2002022777 (CRIEGHTON FRANCIS M [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1-7b *; | [A]WO0234131 (STEREOTAXIS INC [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]WO2004006795 (MAGNETECS INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO2005042053 (MAGNETECS INC [US], et al) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5774091 | - C. GABRIEL ET AL., "The dielectric properties of biological tissues: n. Measurements in the frequency range 10Hz to 20 GHz", PHYS. BIOL., (1996), vol. 41, pages 2251 - 69 |