EP2113677 - Energy absorbing element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Helicopters Aéroport International Marseille Provence 13725 Marignane Cedex / FR | [2014/11] |
Former [2009/45] | For all designated states EUROCOPTER Aéroport International Marseille-Provence 13725 Marignane Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honnorat, Olivier 22 rue Alphonse Daudet 13090 Aix-en-Provence / FR | 02 /
Manfredotti, Thomas 872 route de Cagnes 06480 La Colle sur Loup / FR | [2009/45] | Representative(s) | GPI & Associés EuroParc de Pichaury Bâtiment B2 - 1er Etage 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | GPI & Associés 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière EuroParc de Pichaury, Bât B2 13856 Aix en Provence Cedex 3 / FR | ||
Former [2009/45] | GPI & Associés 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière EuroParc de Pichaury, Bât B2 13856 Aix en Provence Cedex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09005346.3 | 15.04.2009 | [2009/45] | Priority number, date | FR20080002366 | 28.04.2008 Original published format: FR 0802366 | [2009/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113677 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2113677 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16F7/12 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
F16F7/123 (EP,US);
F16F1/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/45] | Title | German: | Energieabsorbierendes Element | [2009/45] | English: | Energy absorbing element | [2009/45] | French: | Elément absorbant d'énergie | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 19.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2009 | AT | 01.01.2014 | BG | 01.01.2014 | CY | 01.01.2014 | CZ | 01.01.2014 | DK | 01.01.2014 | EE | 01.01.2014 | ES | 01.01.2014 | FI | 01.01.2014 | HR | 01.01.2014 | IT | 01.01.2014 | LT | 01.01.2014 | LV | 01.01.2014 | MC | 01.01.2014 | MK | 01.01.2014 | MT | 01.01.2014 | NL | 01.01.2014 | PL | 01.01.2014 | RO | 01.01.2014 | SE | 01.01.2014 | SI | 01.01.2014 | SK | 01.01.2014 | TR | 01.01.2014 | NO | 01.04.2014 | GR | 02.04.2014 | IE | 15.04.2014 | LU | 15.04.2014 | BE | 30.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | IS | 01.05.2014 | PT | 02.05.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 15.04.2009 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
TR | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 15.04.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.04.2009 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 15.04.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 15.04.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 15.04.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
IE | 15.04.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.04.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.04.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.04.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
NL | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 01.01.2014 | |
IS | 01.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US3482872 (CHAMBERLAIN THOMAS E) [X] 1-4,7,9,11 * figures 1-5 * [Y] 5-6,12 [I] 8,10; | [Y]EP0927659 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 5-6,12 * figure 3a *; | [A]US3447833 (RICE HERBERT C) [A] 1 * figure 3a * | by applicant | US3482872 | US3447833 | FR2695177 |