EP2243618 - Method for manufacturing a thermoplastic film with a 3D structured surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordenia Deutschland Gronau GmbH Jöbkesweg 11 48599 Gronau / DE | [2010/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gründken, Marcel Eper Strasse 12a 48599 Gronau / DE | 02 /
Bader, Herbert Feldbauerschaft 62a 48356 Nordwalde / DE | 03 /
Hagemann, Andreas Erlenbruch 6a 46414 Rhede / DE | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [2012/44] |
Former [2010/43] | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Andrejewski Honke Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09005613.6 | 22.04.2009 | [2010/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2243618 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2243618 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B29C59/04, B29C43/22, B29C47/88, B29C69/02 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
B29C43/222 (EP,US);
B29C59/04 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/001 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/18 (KR);
B29C48/9145 (EP,US);
B29D7/01 (KR);
C08J5/18 (KR);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/43] | B29C59/04, B29C43/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer thermoplastischen Folie mit einer dreidimensional strukturierten Oberfläche | [2010/43] | English: | Method for manufacturing a thermoplastic film with a 3D structured surface | [2010/43] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un film thermoplastique doté d'une surface structurée tridimensionnelle | [2010/43] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.10.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2009 | CY | 31.10.2012 | CZ | 31.10.2012 | DK | 31.10.2012 | EE | 31.10.2012 | FI | 31.10.2012 | HR | 31.10.2012 | IT | 31.10.2012 | LT | 31.10.2012 | LV | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | MK | 31.10.2012 | MT | 31.10.2012 | NL | 31.10.2012 | PL | 31.10.2012 | RO | 31.10.2012 | SE | 31.10.2012 | SI | 31.10.2012 | SK | 31.10.2012 | TR | 31.10.2012 | BG | 31.01.2013 | NO | 31.01.2013 | GR | 01.02.2013 | ES | 11.02.2013 | IS | 28.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | GB | 22.04.2013 | IE | 22.04.2013 | LU | 22.04.2013 | BE | 30.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | FR | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
MK | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
GB | 22.04.2013 | ||
IE | 22.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
GB | 22.04.2013 | ||
IE | 22.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
GB | 22.04.2013 | ||
IE | 22.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
GB | 22.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
GB | 22.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 31.10.2012 | |
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 31.10.2012 | |
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
NO | 31.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4363686 (KOMAREK ERNST) [Y] 4* column 1, line 32 - line 56 *; | [Y]DE19524076 (HCD GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5-7 * column 3, line 9 - line 30 * * example 3 *; | [XY]WO9922931 (KARSZES WILLIAM M [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 5 * * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 5 * * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 22 * * page 7, line 1 - line 10 * * page 10, line 5 - line 13 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 4-7; | [Y]EP1316402 (TESA AG [DE]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0121] *; | [X]EP1504877 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-2 * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] , [0015] , [0019] , [0021] , [0022] , [0030] , [0034] * * figures 2,4,5,7 *; | [Y]DE10346124 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0068] * | by applicant | WO9922931 | WO2006122606 | WO2007104588 | EP1852239 | DE102006021477 |