EP2117081 - Electric contact element for touch contacting electric test items and corresponding contact assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/46] | Electric contact element for touch contacting electric test items and corresponding contact assembly | ||
[2017/52] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Feinmetall GmbH Zeppelinstrasse 8 71083 Herrenberg / DE | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiland, Achim Falkentorstr. 20/1 71157 Hildrizhausen / DE | 02 /
Böhm, Gunther Am Frauenhofgut 1 71154 Nufringen / DE | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Clarenbach, Carl-Philipp, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/45] |
Former [2009/46] | Grosse, Rainer, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09005696.1 | 23.04.2009 | [2009/46] | Priority number, date | DE20081023761 | 09.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008023761 | [2009/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117081 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2117081 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/45] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2117081 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/24, G01R1/067, G01R1/073 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
G01R1/06733 (EP,US);
G01R1/067 (KR);
G01R1/073 (KR);
G01R1/07357 (EP,US);
H01R13/2407 (EP,US);
H01R13/2435 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/46] | H01R11/18, G01R1/067, // G01R1/073 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/45] |
Former [2009/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrisches Kontaktelement | [2017/52] | English: | Electric contact element for touch contacting electric test items and corresponding contact assembly | [2021/10] | French: | Elément de contact électrique destiné à la mise en contact sensible d'échantillons électriques et agencement de mise en contact correspondant | [2021/10] |
Former [2009/46] | Elektrisches Kontaktelement zum Berührungskontaktieren von elektrischen Prüflingen sowie entsprechende Kontaktieranordnung | ||
Former [2009/46] | Electric contact element for touch contacting electric test items and corresponding contact assembly | ||
Former [2009/46] | Elément de contact électrique destiné à la mise en contact sensible d'échantillons électriques et agencement de mise en contact correspondant | Examination procedure | 24.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 21.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.08.2019
27.04.2020
WITHDRAWN FormFactor, Inc. 7005 Southfront Road Livermore, California 94551 / US Opponent's representative Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2020/23] |
Former [2019/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.08.2019
WITHDRAWN FormFactor, Inc. 7005 Southfront Road Livermore, California 94551 / US Opponent's representative Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | 22.08.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.12.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.09.2020 | 29.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.03.2021 | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.03.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 25.08.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2009 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | DK | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | ES | 07.11.2018 | FI | 07.11.2018 | HR | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | LV | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | MK | 07.11.2018 | MT | 07.11.2018 | PL | 07.11.2018 | SE | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | TR | 07.11.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | NO | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | PT | 07.03.2019 | GB | 23.04.2019 | LU | 23.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
MT | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 23.04.2019 | ||
LU | 23.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 23.04.2019 | ||
LU | 23.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 23.04.2019 | ||
LU | 23.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 07.11.2018 | |
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 23.04.2019 | ||
LU | 23.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | CZ | 07.11.2018 | |
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
GB | 23.04.2019 | ||
LU | 23.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | CZ | 07.11.2018 | |
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | CZ | 07.11.2018 | |
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | CZ | 07.11.2018 | |
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CZ | 07.11.2018 | |
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 07.11.2018 | |
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 07.11.2018 | |
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | DK | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | |
NO | 07.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2004121627 (GRUBE GARY W [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7,9,13,14,16,19,20,22,23,30 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 24 * * figure 1a * * page 2, paragraph 26 * * figure 7 * * figure 3 * [Y] 24,26; | [XY]US2006170440 (SUDIN HENDRA [TW]) [X] 1,4,8,11,17,21,29 * figure 2 * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 30 * * figure 15 * * figure 4 * * figure 20 * [Y] 27,28; | [XY]US2008001612 (KISTER JANUARY [US]) [X] 1,12,15,18 * figure 1 * * figure 7a * * page 2, paragraph 31 * [Y] 31,33,34; | [Y]US2002113612 (NGUYEN VINH T [US]) [Y] 24,26,27,33,34 * figure 2e * * figure 3a * * page 3, paragraph 31 * * figure 2c * * page 3, paragraph 32 *; | [Y]WO2007097559 (SAEHANMICROTECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 28,31 * page 7, line 24 * * figure 4 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2006073712 (SUHIR EPHRAIM [US]) [A] 17,18,33,34 * figure 5 * * figure 9 * * abstract *; | [A]US2006046528 (BEAMAN BRIAN S [US], et al) [A] 1,5,7,16,18,19,21,30-34 * abstract * * figure 1 * | Examination | WO2007029791 | EP1923708 | EP0500227 | Opposition | US2006238209 | WO2007029791 | US2006170440 | US2005110506 | US4027935 | US2002070743 | US3806801 | US7671610 | JP2000214182 |