EP2243713 - A disposable very lightweight package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. IP Departement Av. Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. IP Departement, Av. Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cerveny, Mr. Jean-Paul 363, Allée du Luxembourg 88800 Vittel / FR | 02 /
Detrois, Christian 19 Rue Jacques Brel 88190 Golbey / FR | 03 /
Hartwig, Klaus 11 Rue du Grand Verger 54000 Nancy / FR | 04 /
Lüpke, Erik 55-57 Avenue Foch 54000 Nancy / FR | 05 /
Vigny-Schmitt, Murielle 11 Alée Haye Jean Cottant 88000 Vittel / FR | [2010/43] | Application number, filing date | 09005791.0 | 25.04.2009 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2243713 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D30/24, B65B9/13, // B65D75/46, B65D75/48 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
B65D31/147 (EP,US);
B65B3/06 (EP,US);
B65B43/123 (EP,US);
B65D75/46 (EP,US);
B65D75/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sehr leichte Einwegverpackung | [2010/43] | English: | A disposable very lightweight package | [2010/43] | French: | Emballage très léger jetable | [2010/43] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1247191 (AUTOPACK LTD) [Y] 1-4,6,9,11 * page 1, line 68 - page 2, line 88; figure . *; | [Y]US3760558 (KAMINSKY I, et al) [Y] 1-4,6,9,11 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE2919567 (ANIDRITI ORESTE [IT], et al) [Y] 1-4,6,7,9,11 * page 14 - page 23; figures 1-3 *; | [XAY]US4346546 (TASKER SIDNEY) [X] 12 * column 2, line 55 - column 12, line 21; figures 1-21 * [A] 8,10,13 [Y] 1-4,6,9,11,15,16; | [YA]FR2691945 (PERRET MICHEL [FR]) [Y] 1-4,6,7,9,11 * page 2, line 13 - line 24; figure 1 * [A] 5; | [YA]WO2004108534 (LINDNER WOLFGANG [AT]) [Y] 15,16 * page 7 - page 10; figures 1-9; claims 1-45 *[A] 14 |