EP2157101 - HSP peptides and analogs for modulation of immune responses via antigen presenting cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andromeda Bio Tech Ltd. Building No. 16 Kiryat Weizmann 76326 Rehovot / IL | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karmon, Yoram 6 Martin Buber Street 49407 Petah Tikva / IL | 02 /
Avron, Ann Gordon Street 49/4 76286 Rehvot / IL | 03 /
Elias, Dana Zevulon Street 14 70700 Gedera / IL | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | [2014/39] |
Former [2010/08] | Straus, Alexander Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09005836.3 | 30.01.2003 | [2010/08] | Priority number, date | US20020352594P | 31.01.2002 Original published format: US 352594 P | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2157101 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2157101 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/50, A61K49/00, A61K38/00, C07K14/47 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
G01N33/6863 (EP,US);
A61K49/0004 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K14/4713 (EP,US);
G01N33/5008 (EP,US);
G01N33/5011 (EP,US);
G01N33/502 (EP,US);
G01N33/5047 (EP,US);
G01N33/505 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/08] | C07K14/47, A61K35/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | HSP-Peptide und Analoga zur Modulation von Immunantworten mittels antigenpräsentierenden Zellen | [2010/08] | English: | HSP peptides and analogs for modulation of immune responses via antigen presenting cells | [2010/08] | French: | Peptides HSP et analogues pour la modulation de réponses immunes via des cellules présentant l'antigène | [2010/08] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 06.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03702990.7 / EP1575479 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030702990) is 16.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2003 | AT | 24.09.2014 | BG | 24.09.2014 | CY | 24.09.2014 | CZ | 24.09.2014 | DK | 24.09.2014 | EE | 24.09.2014 | FI | 24.09.2014 | MC | 24.09.2014 | NL | 24.09.2014 | SE | 24.09.2014 | SI | 24.09.2014 | SK | 24.09.2014 | TR | 24.09.2014 | GR | 25.12.2014 | PT | 26.01.2015 | IE | 30.01.2015 | LU | 30.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
SE | 24.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6180103 (COHEN IRUN R [IL], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * * SEQ ID NO:8 is identical to SEQ ID NO:3 of the current application *; | [A] - BINDER R J ET AL, "Cutting edge: heat shock protein gp96 induces maturation and migration of CD11c+ cells in vivo.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 1 DEC 2000, (20001201), vol. 165, no. 11, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 6029 - 6035, XP002390148 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - SINGH-JASUJA HARPREET ET AL, "The heat shock protein gp96 induces maturation of dendritic cells and down-regulation of its receptor", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, WEINHEIM, DE, (200008), vol. 30, no. 8, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 2211 - 2215, XP002174948 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-4141(2000)30:8<2211::AID-IMMU2211>3.0.CO;2-0 | [A] - RAZ I ET AL, "beta-cell function in new-onset type 1 diabetes and immunomodulation with a heat-shock protein peptide (DiaPep277): a randomised, double-blind, phase II trial", LANCET THE, LANCET LIMITED. LONDON, GB, (20011124), vol. 358, no. 9295, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 1749 - 1753, XP004805546 [A] 1-7 * discloses the peptide sequence of DiaPep277, which is identical to SEQ ID NO:3 of the current application; page 1750 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(01)06801-5 | by applicant | EP0262710 | WO8912455 | WO9102542 | EP0417271 | WO9204049 | US5114844 | WO9402509 | US5348945 | WO9429459 | WO9525744 | WO9610039 | WO9611948 | WO9616083 | WO9618646 | WO9619236 | WO9632957 | US5578303 | WO9701959 | WO9711966 | JPH09241159 | US5671848 | WO9808536 | US5736146 | US5780034 | JPH10212230 | US5869058 | US5958416 | US5985270 | US5993803 | WO0027870 | US6110746 | US6180103 | WO0143691 | US6322790 | - JINDAL ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL., (1989), vol. 9, page 2279 | - BECKER J.; CRAIG A. E., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1994), vol. 219, page 11 | - VAN EDEN ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1998), vol. 19, page 303 | - ELIAS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1991), vol. 88, page 3088 | - BIRK ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1996), vol. 93, page 1032 | - VAN EDEN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 331, page 171 | - BIRK ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1999), vol. 96, page 5159 | - CHEN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 162, page 3212 | - OHASHI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 164, pages 558 - 61 | - JANEWAY ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (2001), vol. 98, pages 7461 - 7468 | - COLIN C. A.; MATZINGER P., SEMINARS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 12, pages 231 - 238 | - RE, F.; STROMINGER, J. L., "Toll-like receptor 2 (Tlr2) and Tlr4 differentially activate human dendritic cells", J BIOL CHEM, (2001), vol. 276, pages 37692 - 9 | - PILLAI ET AL., CURR. OPIN. CHEM. BIOL., (2001), vol. 5, page 447 | - FINGL ET AL., The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, (1975), page L | - WHELAN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (2000), vol. 164, pages 6453 - 6460 | - J BIOL CHEM, vol. 276, pages 37692 - 9 | - OHKAWARA ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2002), vol. 123, pages 256 - 70 | - MAHLER ET AL., GENOMICS, (1999), vol. 55, pages 147 - 56 |