EP2113788 - Mobile radar and planar antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinoda, Hiroshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Morinaga, Mitsutoshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2009/45] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09005847.0 | 27.04.2009 | [2009/45] | Priority number, date | JP20080117019 | 28.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008117019 | [2009/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2113788 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/42, G01S13/93, G01S13/44, G01S7/35, H01Q3/26, H01Q19/06, H01Q21/06, // G01S7/28, G01S13/34, G01S3/74 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
G01S13/931 (EP,US);
G01S13/42 (EP,US);
G01S13/4454 (EP,US);
G01S13/4463 (EP,US);
G01S7/352 (EP,US);
G01S7/356 (EP,US);
G01S7/4017 (EP,US);
G01S7/4021 (EP,US);
G01S7/4056 (EP,US);
H01Q3/2635 (EP,US);
G01S13/34 (EP,US);
G01S2013/0263 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9321 (EP,US);
G01S2013/93271 (EP,US);
G01S3/74 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/45] | G01S13/42, G01S13/93 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mobiles Radar und Planarantenne | [2009/45] | English: | Mobile radar and planar antenna | [2009/45] | French: | Radar mobile et antenne planaire | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/45] | 11.06.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JPH09101361 | JP2003270316 | JP2007240313 |