Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2113685
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2113685Global Dossier 21.03.2012B1
EP2113685 04.11.2009A1
Priority number Date
DE102008021280 28.04.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ATE550576T 15.04.2012T1
Priority number Date
DE102008021280 28.04.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102008021280 15.10.2009B3
Priority number Date
DE102008021280 28.04.2008