EP2113685 - Gearbox with continuously variable translation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weitzel, Michael Hauptstr. 129 67437 Lindenberg / DE | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/45] | Representative(s) | Hocker, Thomas Maximilianstrasse 23 b 67433 Neustadt / Weinstrasse / DE | [2012/12] |
Former [2009/45] | Hocker, Thomas Maximilianstrasse 23 b 67433 Neustadt / Weinstrasse / DE | Application number, filing date | 09005867.8 | 28.04.2009 | [2009/45] | Priority number, date | DE20081021280 | 28.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008021280 | [2009/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113685 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2113685 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16H29/16 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
F16H29/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/45] | F16H29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/45] | Title | German: | Getriebe mit stufenlose verstellbarer Übersetzung | [2009/45] | English: | Gearbox with continuously variable translation | [2009/45] | French: | Boîte de vitesse dotée d'un braquet variable en continu | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 21.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2009 | CY | 21.03.2012 | CZ | 21.03.2012 | DK | 21.03.2012 | EE | 21.03.2012 | FI | 21.03.2012 | HR | 21.03.2012 | LT | 21.03.2012 | LV | 21.03.2012 | MK | 21.03.2012 | MT | 21.03.2012 | NL | 21.03.2012 | PL | 21.03.2012 | RO | 21.03.2012 | SE | 21.03.2012 | SI | 21.03.2012 | SK | 21.03.2012 | TR | 21.03.2012 | IE | 28.04.2012 | LU | 28.04.2012 | BE | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | BG | 21.06.2012 | NO | 21.06.2012 | GR | 22.06.2012 | ES | 02.07.2012 | IS | 21.07.2012 | PT | 23.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 28.04.2012 | ||
LU | 28.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 28.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 28.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 28.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 28.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
IE | 28.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 21.03.2012 | |
NO | 21.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR778778 (KAST, OTHON)[DA] 1-9; | [XA]GB1071716 (TAKEJI OKANO) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * [A] 2-9 | by applicant | FR778778 | GB1071716 |