18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
25.05.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] |
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
04.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
21.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
13.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] |
24.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
17.06.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |
10.06.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.06.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.12.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] |
19.10.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.10.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] |
19.08.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.04.2010 |
First examination report |
|
01.04.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.03.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] |
09.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2009 |
Publication of search report |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
24.07.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
24.07.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
24.07.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
12.06.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
08.05.2009 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|