EP2078833 - Sound pressure dampener for an auxiliary assembly for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TVE Schutzrechte GmbH Von- Graefe-Strasse 19 45470 Mühlheim/Ruhr / DE | [2011/04] |
Former [2009/29] | For all designated states Ponte Vecchio Consult Sagl Vicolo Pontevecchio 5 6600 Muralto / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schübler, Hans Hubert Strippchens Hof 19 45479 Mühlheim an der Ruhr / DE | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09005879.3 | 14.02.2005 | [2009/29] | Priority number, date | DE20042002341U | 13.02.2004 Original published format: DE 202004002341 U | [2009/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2078833 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2078833 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2078833 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/00, F01N1/08, B60K25/06 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
B60K25/06 (EP);
B60H1/00535 (EP);
B60H2001/006 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/29] | F01N1/08, B60K25/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Title | German: | Druckschalldämpfer für eine Versorgungsaggregateanordnung für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2009/29] | English: | Sound pressure dampener for an auxiliary assembly for a motor vehicle | [2009/29] | French: | Amortisseur de bruit de refoulement pour un ensemble auxiliaire pour un véhicule automobile | [2009/29] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05003111.1 / EP1564060 | Divisional application(s) | EP10183209.5 / EP2273120 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050003111) is 19.05.2006 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.02.2005 | CY | 20.07.2011 | CZ | 20.07.2011 | EE | 20.07.2011 | FI | 20.07.2011 | IE | 20.07.2011 | IT | 20.07.2011 | LT | 20.07.2011 | PL | 20.07.2011 | RO | 20.07.2011 | SE | 20.07.2011 | SI | 20.07.2011 | SK | 20.07.2011 | TR | 20.07.2011 | BG | 20.10.2011 | GR | 21.10.2011 | ES | 31.10.2011 | IS | 20.11.2011 | PT | 21.11.2011 | LU | 14.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
TR | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
LU | 14.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
TR | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB891159 (HOLMES & CO LTD W C, et al) [X] 1,5 * figure 5; claim 2 *; | [XA]GB986576 (GRUENZWEIG & HARTMANN) [X] 1,6 * figure 2; claims 1,9 * [A] 8,9; | [X]EP0458891 (SVENSKA ROTOR MASKINER) [X] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0542169 (WILMS PETER [DE]) [A] 1,8-10 * column 1, line 3 - line 16 * * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 2; figure - *; | [X]DE19606698 (VOLVO AB [SE]) [X] 1-6 * figure 2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP1065100 (WELGRO BV [NL]); | [A]DE10011023 (RIESE WOLFGANG [DE]) | by applicant | DE19606698 |