EP2116789 - Compact heating system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MHG Heiztechnik GmbH Brauerstrasse 2 21244 Buchholz in der Nordheide / DE | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niedermayer, Markus Upper Borg 190 28357 Bremen / DE | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Richter, Werdermann, Gerbaulet & Hofmann Patentanwälte Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09005925.4 | 29.04.2009 | [2009/46] | Priority number, date | DE20081022150 | 05.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008022150 | DE20081023254 | 13.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008023254 | [2009/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2116789 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2116789 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/08, F24H1/12, F24H9/02, F24D12/02, F24D15/02, F24H9/06, F24H9/14, F25B30/02, F24D11/02 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
F25B30/02 (EP);
F24D12/02 (EP);
F24D15/02 (EP);
F24H1/08 (EP);
F24H9/02 (EP);
F24H9/06 (EP);
F24H9/14 (EP);
F24H9/142 (EP);
F24D2200/046 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/46] | F24H1/08, F24H1/12, F24H9/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kompakt-Heizzentrale | [2009/46] | English: | Compact heating system | [2009/46] | French: | Centrale de chauffage compacte | [2009/46] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 03.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE29817899U (FOERSTER BRITTA [DE]) [X] 1-5,13,14 * pages 5-12 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 8 [I] 6; | [X]DE10142779 (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,10,12 * paragraphs [0022] - [0040] * * figures 1-3, 5 *; | [Y]DE202007010809U (HAASE MARLENE [DE]) [Y] 8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29609069U (IWE INNOVATIVE WIRTSCHAFTLICHE [DE]) [A] 1,5-7,9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0070560 (POHLMEYER LAURENTIUS [DE]) [A] 1 * pages 10,11 * * figures 1, 2 * |