EP2113706 - Press fit connector with improved coupling part for holding a press sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK, TR | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wavin B.V. Stationsplein 3 8011 CW Zwolle / NL | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nyhuis, Thorsten Erlenweg 11 49843 Uelsen / DE | 02 /
Prenger, Jan Hendrik Lageweg 2 7793 HG Hoogenweg / NL | [2009/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/27] | de Vries, Janna Wavin T&I P.O. Box 110 7700 AC Dedemsvaart / NL | ||
Former [2009/45] | de Vries, Janna Wavin T&I P.O. Box 110 7700 AC Dedemsvaart / NL | Application number, filing date | 09005929.6 | 29.04.2009 | [2009/45] | Priority number, date | NL20081035370 | 29.04.2008 Original published format: NL 1035370 | [2009/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113706 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2113706 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/207 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
F16L33/2078 (EP);
F16L13/143 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/45] | Title | German: | Druckverbinder mit verbessertem Kupplungselement zum Halten einer Druckhülse | [2009/45] | English: | Press fit connector with improved coupling part for holding a press sleeve | [2009/45] | French: | Connecteur d'insertion avec pièce de couplage amélioré pour maintenir un manchon de presse | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.07.2012 | FI | 04.07.2012 | LV | 04.07.2012 | MC | 04.07.2012 | MK | 04.07.2012 | MT | 04.07.2012 | RO | 04.07.2012 | SE | 04.07.2012 | SI | 04.07.2012 | TR | 04.07.2012 | BG | 04.10.2012 | NO | 04.10.2012 | GR | 05.10.2012 | IS | 04.11.2012 | PT | 05.11.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2015/13] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MC | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/01] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MC | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 04.07.2012 | |
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 04.07.2012 | |
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | SI | 04.07.2012 | |
NO | 04.10.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | SI | 04.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19735919 (HEWING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - line 8 * [Y] 4,5; | [X]GB561283 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD CO LTD, et al) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]US2410600 (IRVING COWLES) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [XY]EP0067063 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 6,8 * abstract * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]DE29901935U (JAEGGI GEORG [AT]) [Y] 9,10 * figure - *; | [XY]EP1126206 (ROTH WERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 6,7,11,12 * abstract * * column 5, line 8 - line 13 * [Y] 9,10 | by applicant | EP0611911 |