EP2130604 - Honeycomb structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ibiden Co., Ltd. 1, Kandacho 2-chome Ogaki-shi, Gifu 503-8604 / JP | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohno, Kazushige Ibiden Co., Ltd. Ogakikita Plant 1-1, Kitagata Ibigawa-Cho Ibi-Gun Gifu 501-0695 / JP | 02 /
Ido, Takahiko Ibiden Co., Ltd. Ogakikita Plant 1-1, Kitagata Ibigawa-Cho Ibi-Gun Gifu 501-0695 / JP | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006090.6 | 04.05.2009 | [2009/50] | Priority number, date | WO2008JP59262 | 20.05.2008 Original published format: PCT/JP2008/059262 | [2009/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2130604 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2130604 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/04, B01J29/00, B01D53/92, F01N3/00, B01D53/94, B01J29/76, B01J35/00, C04B38/00, B01D46/24, F01N3/20 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
F01N3/2828 (EP,US);
B01J29/06 (EP,US);
B01J29/072 (EP,US);
B01J29/7615 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B01J37/0009 (EP,US);
C04B38/0016 (EP,US);
B01J2229/186 (EP,US);
B01J29/80 (EP,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J35/58 (EP,US);
C04B2111/0081 (EP,US);
F01N2510/063 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0016, C04B35/18, C04B35/80, C04B38/0009 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/50] | B01J35/04, B01J29/00, B01D53/92, F01N3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wabenstruktur | [2009/50] | English: | Honeycomb structure | [2009/50] | French: | Structure en nid d'abeille | [2009/50] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/34] | 08.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0415410 (TOSOH CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * examples 4.1-4.16; tables 4.1,4.2 * * page 7, line 49 - page 10, line 19 * * claims 11,12 *; | [X]EP0526896 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 2, lines 31-53 * * page 3, lines 22-30 * * page 4, lines 45-56 * * example 4 * * figure 1 * * claims 1,6 *; | [X]JPH10141047 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0012] - [0016] - [0025] - [0027] * * table 1 *; | [X]JPH1199335 (CATALYSTS & CHEM IND CO) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0016] , [0023] - [0025] * * example 4; tables 1,2 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1736220 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * claim - * * figure - *; | [X]US2007259770 (HOFMANN LOTHAR [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0011] - [0015] - [0019] , [0021] , [0026] - [0031] *; | [E]WO2009103549 (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE], et al) [E] 1-4 * page 10, line 10 - page 13, line 27 *; | [E]EP2105182 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-10 * paragraph [0063] ** figure - *; | [E]EP2116293 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE]) [E] 1-4 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0035] * * claims 7-10 * * figure - *; | [XY] - R. WUSIRIKA ; S. OGUNWUMI ; W. LUCAS, "Extruded Zeolite Catalysts for Lean Exhaust Application", SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES, Warrendale, Pennsylvania, USA, (20050411), no. 2005-01-1118, pages 1 - 11, XP002561687 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * * More particularly: * * Abstract, page 2: left hand column, line 1 to right hand column, line 8; page 4: "Bimetallic catalysts"; page 8: "Physical properties evaluation; page 9: "Consideration for a zeolite based NOX catalyst"; Tables 1 and 2 * [Y] 1-10 | Examination | EP1840347 | by applicant | JPH09103653 | JP2005063653 |