EP2116803 - Coaxial profile and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erbslöh Aluminium GmbH Siebeneicker Strasse 235 42553 Velbert / DE | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sucke, Norbert William Am Thelenbusch 61 47269 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
Breindl, Reiner Dorfstrasse 12a 45527 Hattingen / DE | 03 /
Boyraz, Ismail Konsumstrasse 37 44809 Bochum / DE | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Buse, Mentzel, Ludewig Patentanwaltskanzlei Kleiner Werth 34 42275 Wuppertal / DE | [2016/11] |
Former [2009/46] | Patentanwälte Buse, Mentzel, Ludewig Kleiner Werth 34 42275 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006102.9 | 05.05.2009 | [2009/46] | Priority number, date | DE20081022933 | 09.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008022933 | DE20082006379U | 09.05.2008 Original published format: DE 202008006379 U | [2009/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2116803 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2116803 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2116803 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/10, F28F1/00, F28F9/04, B21C23/10, B23D31/00, B21C23/08, F28F9/02, // F25B40/00 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
F28D7/106 (EP);
B21C23/085 (EP);
B23D31/002 (EP);
F25B40/00 (EP);
F28F1/006 (EP);
F28F9/0246 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/46] | F28D7/10, F28F1/00, F28F9/04, B21C23/10, F25B40/00, // F25B40/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/19] |
Former [2009/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Koaxialprofil und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen Koaxialprofils | [2009/46] | English: | Coaxial profile and method for manufacturing the same | [2009/46] | French: | Profilé coaxial et procédé de fabrication d'un tel profilé coaxial | [2009/46] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 26.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.05.2009 | CY | 16.03.2016 | DK | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | ES | 16.03.2016 | FI | 16.03.2016 | HR | 16.03.2016 | IT | 16.03.2016 | LT | 16.03.2016 | LV | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | MK | 16.03.2016 | MT | 16.03.2016 | NL | 16.03.2016 | PL | 16.03.2016 | RO | 16.03.2016 | SE | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SK | 16.03.2016 | TR | 16.03.2016 | AT | 05.05.2016 | IE | 05.05.2016 | LU | 05.05.2016 | BE | 31.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | BG | 16.06.2016 | GB | 16.06.2016 | NO | 16.06.2016 | GR | 17.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | PT | 18.07.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 05.05.2009 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
AT | 05.05.2016 | ||
IE | 05.05.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GB | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.05.2009 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
AT | 05.05.2016 | ||
IE | 05.05.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GB | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | DK | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
AT | 05.05.2016 | ||
IE | 05.05.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GB | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | DK | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 05.05.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GB | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | DK | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GB | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | DK | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | DK | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]US6098704 (TSUCHIYA SHIZUO [JP], et al) [ID] 1-8 * column 4, lines 37-46; figures 3, 5B *; | [A]US5407116 (NISHISHITA KUNIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 9-15 * column 3, lines 33-7 - column 4; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5133492 (WOHRSTEIN FRANZ X [US], et al) [A] 9-15 * column 3, lines 67-37 - column 4; figures 4, 4a, 4b, 5, 5a, 5b *; | [A]US3568488 (FRANKS NEWELL A) [A] 9-15 * column 8, lines 69-13 - column 9; figure 1 *; | [A]DE60102027T (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP [JP]) [A] 9-15 * figures 5A-5D * | by applicant | US6098704 | DE10053000 |