EP2123342 - Device and method for measuring aerosols and/or flowing liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FESTO AG & Co. KG Ruiter Strasse 82 73734 Esslingen / DE | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartnagel, Rolf Hohenkreuzweg 6 73732 Esslingen / DE | 02 /
Pawlik, Gottfried Wannengrund 12 71554 Weissach / DE | 03 /
Völkl, Martin Morgenäcker 8 73105 Dürnau / DE | 04 /
Mühlena, Manuel Schulstrasse 16 71364 Winnenden / DE | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Vogler, Bernd, et al Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Vogler, Bernd, et al Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006192.0 | 07.05.2009 | [2009/48] | Priority number, date | DE20081023739 | 15.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008023739 | [2009/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2123342 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2123342 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/00, B01D46/44, G01N15/06 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
B01D46/446 (EP);
B01D46/003 (EP);
B01D46/0095 (EP);
B01D46/444 (EP);
B01D46/62 (EP);
B01D2267/30 (EP);
G01N15/0618 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erfassung von Aerosolen und/oder strömenden Flüssigkeiten | [2009/48] | English: | Device and method for measuring aerosols and/or flowing liquids | [2009/48] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détection d'aérosols et/ou de liquides s'écoulant | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 14.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2009 | CY | 02.05.2012 | CZ | 02.05.2012 | DK | 02.05.2012 | EE | 02.05.2012 | FI | 02.05.2012 | HR | 02.05.2012 | LT | 02.05.2012 | LV | 02.05.2012 | MK | 02.05.2012 | MT | 02.05.2012 | NL | 02.05.2012 | PL | 02.05.2012 | RO | 02.05.2012 | SE | 02.05.2012 | SI | 02.05.2012 | SK | 02.05.2012 | TR | 02.05.2012 | IE | 07.05.2012 | LU | 07.05.2012 | BE | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | BG | 02.08.2012 | NO | 02.08.2012 | GR | 03.08.2012 | ES | 13.08.2012 | IS | 02.09.2012 | PT | 03.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MK | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IE | 07.05.2012 | ||
LU | 07.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MK | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IE | 07.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MK | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
IE | 07.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
IE | 07.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
IE | 07.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 02.05.2012 | |
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 02.05.2012 | |
NO | 02.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4140478 (EAT ELEKTRO HANDEL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 25 - line 35; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3; | [Y]US5271750 (ABBOTT KENNETH E [US], et al) [Y] 3 * abstract * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 20 * * column 6, line 39 - line 63 *; | [A]DE9400480U (T E T UMWELTTECHNIK GES FUER L [DE]) [A] * page 3, line 34 - line 42; figure 1 ** page 4, line 24 - line 36 * | by applicant | DE4140478 | US5271750 | DE9400480U |