EP2082855 - Indexable cutting tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thiele, Rene Walter-Meusel-Strasse 48 09114 Chemnitz / DE | 02 /
Patterson, Harvey L. 2080 Central Avenue Duarte, California 41010 / US | [2009/52] |
Former [2009/42] | 01 /
Thiele, Rene Dorotheenstrasse 13 09113 Chemnitz / DE | ||
02 /
Patterson, Harvey L. 2080 Central Avenue Duarte, California 41010 / US | |||
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
THIELE, Rene Dorotheenstrasse 13 09113 Chemnitz / DE | ||
02 /
PATTERSON, Harvey L. 2080 Central Avenue Duarte, California 41010 / US | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006223.3 | 03.02.2004 | [2009/31] | Priority number, date | US20030369164 | 19.02.2003 Original published format: US 369164 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2082855 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/12, B23B31/00, B23B31/107 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
B23B31/1076 (EP,US);
B23B29/043 (EP,US);
B23B2260/124 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1906 (EP,US);
Y10T407/226 (EP,US);
Y10T407/2272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | Schaltbares Schneidwerkzeug | [2009/31] | English: | Indexable cutting tool | [2009/31] | French: | Outil de coupe amovible | [2009/31] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 23.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04707824.1 / EP1601508 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040707824) is 19.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.2011 | 29.02.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4836706 (MITCHELL JAMES L [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]DE29501183U (PAUL DUEMMEL WERKZEUGFABRIK IN [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 21 * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE29921036U (BUERMOOS DENTALWERK [AT]) [Y] 1-7 * page 2, lines 6-13 * * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 24 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1015157 (ISCAR LTD [IL]) [A] 3 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE29501183U | DE29921036U |