EP2116137 - Thermally inhibited polysaccharides and process of preparing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORN Products Development Inc. 5 Westbrook Corporate Center Westchester, IL 60154 / US | [2013/21] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states BRUNOB II B.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
English, Thomas, J. 450 Butternut Drive Parkesburg PA 19365 / US | 02 /
Shah, Kamlesh 401 Falcongate Drive Monmouth Junction NJ 08852 / US | 03 /
Kasica, James, J. 24 Witherspoon Street Whitehouse Station NJ 08889 / US | 04 /
Lane, Christopher, C. 1413 Barclay Boulevard Princeton NJ 08540 / US | 05 /
Shah, Tushar 85 Thorne Street Jersey City NJ 07307 / US | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [2017/08] |
Former [2013/21] | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/46] | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006239.9 | 07.05.2009 | [2009/46] | Priority number, date | US20080051057P | 07.05.2008 Original published format: US 51057 P | US20090423213 | 14.04.2009 Original published format: US 423213 | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2116137 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2116137 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2116137 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2116137 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08B30/12, C08B30/14 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
C08B30/12 (EP,US);
C08B37/00 (US);
A23L29/212 (EP,US);
A23L29/219 (EP,US);
A23L29/25 (EP,US);
A23L7/198 (EP,US);
C08B30/14 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/31] | A23L1/0522, C08B30/12, C08B30/14 | ||
Former IPC [2009/46] | A23L1/0522, C08B30/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/08] |
Former [2009/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Thermisch gehemmte Polysaccharide und Herstellungsverfahren | [2009/46] | English: | Thermally inhibited polysaccharides and process of preparing | [2009/46] | French: | Polysaccharides inhibés thermiquement et procédé de préparation | [2009/46] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/11] | 14.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 20.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.04.2014
14.04.2014
ADMISSIBLE Cargill, Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391 / US Opponent's representative Elseviers, Myriam Cargill R&D Centre Europe BVBA Bedrijvenlaan 9 2800 Mechelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.04.2014
14.04.2014
ADMISSIBLE Cargill, Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391 / US Opponent's representative Elseviers, Myriam Cargill Europe BVBA Bedrijvenlaan 9 B-2800 Mechelen / BE | ||
Former [2015/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.04.2014
14.04.2014
ADMISSIBLE Cargill, Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391 / US Opponent's representative Morariu Radu, Mihai Dorin Cargill Europe bvba Law-IP Bedrijvenlaan 9 2800 Mechelen / BE | ||
Former [2014/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.04.2014
14.04.2014
ADMISSIBLE Cargill, Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391 / US Opponent's representative Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | 19.05.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.11.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.04.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.04.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.08.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.01.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 11.07.2016 | Appeal received No. T1617/16 | 25.08.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 20.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2009 | BG | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | CZ | 10.07.2013 | EE | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | HR | 10.07.2013 | IT | 10.07.2013 | LT | 10.07.2013 | LV | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | MK | 10.07.2013 | MT | 10.07.2013 | PL | 10.07.2013 | RO | 10.07.2013 | SE | 10.07.2013 | SI | 10.07.2013 | SK | 10.07.2013 | NO | 10.10.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | IS | 10.11.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | IE | 07.05.2014 | LU | 07.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.05.2009 | |
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 07.05.2014 | ||
LU | 07.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 10.07.2013 | |
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 07.05.2014 | ||
LU | 07.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 07.05.2014 | ||
LU | 07.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 07.05.2014 | ||
LU | 07.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 07.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 07.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 10.07.2013 | |
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | FI | 10.07.2013 | |
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 10.07.2013 | |
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 10.07.2013 | |
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 10.07.2013 | |
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | SI | 10.07.2013 | |
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 10.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US5932017 (CHIU CHUNG-WAI [US], et al) [XD] 1-15* column 8, lines 13-15 *; | [X]US6010574 (JEFFCOAT ROGER [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 7, lines 55-58 *; | [XP]EP1917868 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [XP] 1-15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027] - [0040]; example 4 * | by applicant | US5725676 | US5932017 | US6261376 | Opposition | WO9604315 | US5830884 |