EP2251679 - Device and method for measuring a product characteristic with a microwave dispersion range sensor assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Döscher Microwave Systems GmbH Am Diebsteich 31 22761 Hamburg / DE | [2015/28] |
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states AMS- Advanced Microwave Systems GmbH Am Diebsteich 31 22761 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knöchel, Reinhard Wachholderweg 23 25336 Elmshorn / DE | 02 /
Taute, Wolfgang Erich-Schwarz-Weg 30 24235 Laboe / DE | 03 /
Döscher, Claas Mansteinstrasse 15 20253 Hamburg / DE | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Müller Verweyen Patentanwälte Friedensallee 290 22763 Hamburg / DE | [2012/43] |
Former [2010/46] | Müller Verweyen Patentanwälte Friesenweg 1 22763 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09006331.4 | 11.05.2009 | [2010/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2251679 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2251679 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/43] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2251679 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N22/04 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
G01N22/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Messung einer Produkteigenschaft mittels einer Mikrowellen-Streufeldsensoranordnung | [2010/46] | English: | Device and method for measuring a product characteristic with a microwave dispersion range sensor assembly | [2010/46] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de mesure d'une caractéristique de produit à l'aide d'un agencement de capteur de champ de dispersion à micro-ondes | [2010/46] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 20.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2013
13.08.2013
ADMISSIBLE TEWS Elektronik GmbH & Co. KG Sperberhorst 10 22459 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2013
TEWS Elektronik GmbH & Co. KG Sperberhorst 10 22459 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | 30.08.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.11.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.10.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2015 | 13.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.03.2015 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2015/35] | 20.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.04.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.04.2015 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2009 | CY | 24.10.2012 | CZ | 24.10.2012 | DK | 24.10.2012 | EE | 24.10.2012 | FI | 24.10.2012 | HR | 24.10.2012 | IT | 24.10.2012 | LT | 24.10.2012 | LV | 24.10.2012 | MC | 24.10.2012 | MK | 24.10.2012 | MT | 24.10.2012 | NL | 24.10.2012 | PL | 24.10.2012 | RO | 24.10.2012 | SE | 24.10.2012 | SI | 24.10.2012 | SK | 24.10.2012 | TR | 24.10.2012 | BG | 24.01.2013 | NO | 24.01.2013 | GR | 25.01.2013 | ES | 04.02.2013 | IS | 24.02.2013 | PT | 25.02.2013 | IE | 11.05.2013 | LU | 11.05.2013 | BE | 31.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | AT | 11.05.2014 | [2015/38] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 11.05.2009 | |
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
MK | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
LU | 11.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
MK | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
BE | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 24.10.2012 | |
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 24.10.2012 | |
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 24.10.2012 | |
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | NO | 24.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4004119 (TEWS ELEKTRONIK DIPL ING MANFR [DE]) [X] 1-15 * column 11, line 29 - line 57 * * figures 15,16 *; | [X]DE102005013647 (KELLER HCW GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0069] *; | [AD]WO2009030314 (TEWS ELEKTRONIK [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1437588 (AMS ADVANCED MICROWAVE SYSTEMS [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202005010375U (TEWS ELEKTRONIK DIPL ING MANFR [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059] *; | [A]EP1321564 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * | [A] - REINHARD KNÖCHEL ET AL, "Stray field ring resonators and a novel trough guide resonator for precise microwave moisture and density measurements; Stray field ring resonators for microwave moisture and density measurements", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, (20070401), vol. 18, no. 4, ISSN 0957-0233, pages 1061 - 1068, XP020118588 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/18/4/014 | by applicant | EP1437588 | DE2928487 | WO2009030314 | EP1331476 | - K. KUPFER, nMaterialfeuchtemessung, EXPERT VERLAG, (1997), pages 145 - 154 |